Senate | 05/21/2009 | Failed to receive affirmative vote in comm. | ||
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Referred to Administration | Journal Page: 2440 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2440 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2367 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3679 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3336 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Record vote | RV#805 | Journal Page: 3336 |
House | 05/13/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3336 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3336 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3290 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3290 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3290 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1771 | |
House | 04/20/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Referred to Border & Intergovernmental Affairs | Journal Page: 594 | |
House | 03/09/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 594 | |
House | 03/02/2009 | Filed |