House | 05/15/2009 | Laid on the table subject to call | Journal Page: 3689 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Companion considered in lieu of | SB1241 | Journal Page: 3689 |
House | 05/15/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 05/13/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1236 | |
House | 04/02/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/02/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Meeting cancelled | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/20/2009 | Recommendations filed with the Speaker | Journal Page: 860 | |
House | 03/09/2009 | Referred to Natural Resources | Journal Page: 595 | |
House | 03/09/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 595 | |
House | 03/03/2009 | Transmitted to the Governor | ||
House | 03/02/2009 | Filed |