Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2140 Compare Versions

The same version is selected twice. Please select two different versions to compare.
OldNewDifferences
11 81R29425 SJM-D
22 By: McClendon H.B. No. 2140
33 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 2140:
44 By: Rose C.S.H.B. No. 2140
55
66
77 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
88 AN ACT
99 relating to tuition and fee exemptions at public institutions of
1010 higher education for certain veterans of the Texas State Guard.
1111 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
1212 SECTION 1. Section 54.203(a), Education Code, is amended to
1313 read as follows:
1414 (a) The governing board of each institution of higher
1515 education shall exempt the following persons from the payment of
1616 all dues, fees, and charges, including fees for correspondence
1717 courses but excluding general deposit fees, student services fees,
1818 and any fees or charges for lodging, board, or clothing, provided
1919 the persons seeking the exemptions were citizens of Texas at the
2020 time they entered the services indicated and have resided in Texas
2121 for at least the period of 12 months before the date of
2222 registration:
2323 (1) all nurses and honorably discharged members of the
2424 armed forces of the United States who served during the
2525 Spanish-American War or during World War I;
2626 (2) all nurses, members of the Women's Army Auxiliary
2727 Corps, members of the Women's Auxiliary Volunteer Emergency
2828 Service, and all honorably discharged members of the armed forces
2929 of the United States who served during World War II except those who
3030 were discharged from service because they were over the age of 38 or
3131 because of a personal request on the part of the person that the
3232 person [he] be discharged from service;
3333 (3) all honorably discharged men and women of the
3434 armed forces of the United States who served during the national
3535 emergency which began on June 27, 1950, and which is referred to as
3636 the Korean War; [and]
3737 (4) all persons who were honorably discharged from the
3838 armed forces of the United States after serving on active military
3939 duty, excluding training, for more than 180 days and who served a
4040 portion of their active duty during:
4141 (A) the Cold War which began on the date of the
4242 termination of the national emergency cited in Subdivision (3) [of
4343 this subsection];
4444 (B) the Vietnam era which began on December 21,
4545 1961, and ended on May 7, 1975;
4646 (C) the Grenada and Lebanon era which began on
4747 August 24, 1982, and ended on July 31, 1984;
4848 (D) the Panama era which began on December 20,
4949 1989, and ended on January 21, 1990;
5050 (E) the Persian Gulf War which began on August 2,
5151 1990, and ends on the date thereafter prescribed by Presidential
5252 proclamation or September 1, 1997, whichever occurs first;
5353 (F) the national emergency by reason of certain
5454 terrorist attacks that began on September 11, 2001; or
5555 (G) any future national emergency declared in
5656 accordance with federal law; and
5757 (5) all persons who:
5858 (A) were honorably discharged from the Texas
5959 State Guard after serving on active duty in the Texas State Guard by
6060 call or order of the governor under Section 431.053, Government
6161 Code, excluding training, for a cumulative period of more than 90
6262 days; and
6363 (B) served a portion of the active duty described
6464 by Paragraph (A) on or after September 1, 1971.
6565 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies
6666 beginning with tuition and fees charged for the 2009 fall semester.
6767 Tuition and fees charged for an academic term or semester before the
6868 2009 fall semester are covered by the law in effect immediately
6969 before the effective date of this Act, and the former law is
7070 continued in effect for that purpose.
7171 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
7272 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
7373 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
7474 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
7575 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.