Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2140 Latest Draft

Bill / House Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            81R29425 SJM-D
 By: McClendon H.B. No. 2140
 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 2140:
 By: Rose C.S.H.B. No. 2140


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to tuition and fee exemptions at public institutions of
 higher education for certain veterans of the Texas State Guard.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 54.203(a), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a) The governing board of each institution of higher
 education shall exempt the following persons from the payment of
 all dues, fees, and charges, including fees for correspondence
 courses but excluding general deposit fees, student services fees,
 and any fees or charges for lodging, board, or clothing, provided
 the persons seeking the exemptions were citizens of Texas at the
 time they entered the services indicated and have resided in Texas
 for at least the period of 12 months before the date of
 registration:
 (1) all nurses and honorably discharged members of the
 armed forces of the United States who served during the
 Spanish-American War or during World War I;
 (2) all nurses, members of the Women's Army Auxiliary
 Corps, members of the Women's Auxiliary Volunteer Emergency
 Service, and all honorably discharged members of the armed forces
 of the United States who served during World War II except those who
 were discharged from service because they were over the age of 38 or
 because of a personal request on the part of the person that the
 person [he] be discharged from service;
 (3) all honorably discharged men and women of the
 armed forces of the United States who served during the national
 emergency which began on June 27, 1950, and which is referred to as
 the Korean War; [and]
 (4) all persons who were honorably discharged from the
 armed forces of the United States after serving on active military
 duty, excluding training, for more than 180 days and who served a
 portion of their active duty during:
 (A) the Cold War which began on the date of the
 termination of the national emergency cited in Subdivision (3) [of
 this subsection];
 (B) the Vietnam era which began on December 21,
 1961, and ended on May 7, 1975;
 (C) the Grenada and Lebanon era which began on
 August 24, 1982, and ended on July 31, 1984;
 (D) the Panama era which began on December 20,
 1989, and ended on January 21, 1990;
 (E) the Persian Gulf War which began on August 2,
 1990, and ends on the date thereafter prescribed by Presidential
 proclamation or September 1, 1997, whichever occurs first;
 (F) the national emergency by reason of certain
 terrorist attacks that began on September 11, 2001; or
 (G) any future national emergency declared in
 accordance with federal law; and
 (5) all persons who:
 (A)  were honorably discharged from the Texas
 State Guard after serving on active duty in the Texas State Guard by
 call or order of the governor under Section 431.053, Government
 Code, excluding training, for a cumulative period of more than 90
 days; and
 (B)  served a portion of the active duty described
 by Paragraph (A) on or after September 1, 1971.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies
 beginning with tuition and fees charged for the 2009 fall semester.
 Tuition and fees charged for an academic term or semester before the
 2009 fall semester are covered by the law in effect immediately
 before the effective date of this Act, and the former law is
 continued in effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.