E | 05/23/2009 | Effective on 9/1/09 | ||
E | 05/23/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 4642 | |
E | 05/18/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4079 | |
Senate | 05/18/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2492 | |
House | 05/18/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3947 | |
House | 05/18/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4079 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3677 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2379 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2379 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2379 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2379 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2379 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2379 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2379 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | ||
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2225 | |
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Testimony taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/11/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | Journal Page: 1933 | |
Senate | 05/01/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1933 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1630 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2010 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Record vote | RV#293 | Journal Page: 1834 |
House | 04/24/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1834 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1834 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 1829 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 1828 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 1803 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Amended | 1-Phillips | Journal Page: 1803 |
House | 04/24/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1803 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1276 | |
House | 04/07/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 602 | |
House | 03/09/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 602 | |
House | 03/03/2009 | Filed |