1 | 1 | | H.B. No. 2225 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to creating a committee to review the process for finding |
---|
6 | 6 | | permanent placements for children in the conservatorship of the |
---|
7 | 7 | | state. |
---|
8 | 8 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 9 | | SECTION 1. (a) The Department of Family and Protective |
---|
10 | 10 | | Services, in conjunction with the adoption review committee |
---|
11 | 11 | | described by Subsection (b) of this section, shall conduct an |
---|
12 | 12 | | extensive review of the foster care system to: |
---|
13 | 13 | | (1) identify obstacles that impede the department's |
---|
14 | 14 | | ability to find a permanent placement for foster children, |
---|
15 | 15 | | including placement by adoption; and |
---|
16 | 16 | | (2) develop ways to improve the foster care system by: |
---|
17 | 17 | | (A) reducing the time a child is in the |
---|
18 | 18 | | conservatorship of the department before being permanently placed; |
---|
19 | 19 | | (B) reducing the number of children in the |
---|
20 | 20 | | conservatorship of the department who are placed outside of their |
---|
21 | 21 | | home county; and |
---|
22 | 22 | | (C) enhancing the procedures for adopting foster |
---|
23 | 23 | | children. |
---|
24 | 24 | | (b) The adoption review committee is composed of the |
---|
25 | 25 | | following nine members: |
---|
26 | 26 | | (1) four members appointed by the executive |
---|
27 | 27 | | commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission as |
---|
28 | 28 | | follows: |
---|
29 | 29 | | (A) an employee of the Department of Family and |
---|
30 | 30 | | Protective Services; |
---|
31 | 31 | | (B) a representative from a licensed |
---|
32 | 32 | | child-placing agency that provides adoption services; |
---|
33 | 33 | | (C) a representative from the Council on |
---|
34 | 34 | | Adoptable Children of Texas; and |
---|
35 | 35 | | (D) an attorney with expertise in handling |
---|
36 | 36 | | adoptions; and |
---|
37 | 37 | | (2) five members appointed by the governor who have |
---|
38 | 38 | | expertise in or a demonstrated commitment to adoption issues. |
---|
39 | 39 | | (c) The adoption review committee shall meet at least |
---|
40 | 40 | | quarterly. |
---|
41 | 41 | | (d) Not later than December 1, 2010, the Department of |
---|
42 | 42 | | Family and Protective Services shall submit a written report of the |
---|
43 | 43 | | results of the review conducted under Subsection (a) of this |
---|
44 | 44 | | section to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of |
---|
45 | 45 | | the house of representatives, the House Committee on Human |
---|
46 | 46 | | Services, and the Senate Committee on Health and Human Services. |
---|
47 | 47 | | The report must include: |
---|
48 | 48 | | (1) a summary of the findings of the review conducted |
---|
49 | 49 | | under Subsection (a) of this section; |
---|
50 | 50 | | (2) a summary of the obstacles identified in the |
---|
51 | 51 | | review that impede the department's ability to find permanent |
---|
52 | 52 | | placements for foster children; |
---|
53 | 53 | | (3) recommendations of actions the department should |
---|
54 | 54 | | take to eliminate the obstacles described by Subdivision (2) of |
---|
55 | 55 | | this subsection; and |
---|
56 | 56 | | (4) any legislative recommendations that would |
---|
57 | 57 | | improve the foster care system. |
---|
58 | 58 | | SECTION 2. Not later than December 1, 2009, the executive |
---|
59 | 59 | | commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission and the |
---|
60 | 60 | | governor shall appoint the members of the adoption review committee |
---|
61 | 61 | | and the adoption review committee shall begin performing its duties |
---|
62 | 62 | | as provided by this Act. |
---|
63 | 63 | | SECTION 3. The adoption review committee is abolished and |
---|
64 | 64 | | this Act expires September 1, 2011. |
---|
65 | 65 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
66 | 66 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
67 | 67 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
68 | 68 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
69 | 69 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
70 | 70 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
71 | 71 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
72 | 72 | | I certify that H.B. No. 2225 was passed by the House on April |
---|
73 | 73 | | 28, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 147, Nays 0, 1 present, not |
---|
74 | 74 | | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
75 | 75 | | No. 2225 on May 25, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 0, |
---|
76 | 76 | | 2 present, not voting. |
---|
77 | 77 | | ______________________________ |
---|
78 | 78 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
79 | 79 | | I certify that H.B. No. 2225 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
80 | 80 | | amendments, on May 21, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
81 | 81 | | 0. |
---|
82 | 82 | | ______________________________ |
---|
83 | 83 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
84 | 84 | | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
85 | 85 | | Date |
---|
86 | 86 | | __________________ |
---|
87 | 87 | | Governor |
---|