Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2225 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 2225


 AN ACT
 relating to creating a committee to review the process for finding
 permanent placements for children in the conservatorship of the
 state.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. (a) The Department of Family and Protective
 Services, in conjunction with the adoption review committee
 described by Subsection (b) of this section, shall conduct an
 extensive review of the foster care system to:
 (1) identify obstacles that impede the department's
 ability to find a permanent placement for foster children,
 including placement by adoption; and
 (2) develop ways to improve the foster care system by:
 (A) reducing the time a child is in the
 conservatorship of the department before being permanently placed;
 (B) reducing the number of children in the
 conservatorship of the department who are placed outside of their
 home county; and
 (C) enhancing the procedures for adopting foster
 children.
 (b) The adoption review committee is composed of the
 following nine members:
 (1) four members appointed by the executive
 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission as
 follows:
 (A) an employee of the Department of Family and
 Protective Services;
 (B) a representative from a licensed
 child-placing agency that provides adoption services;
 (C) a representative from the Council on
 Adoptable Children of Texas; and
 (D) an attorney with expertise in handling
 adoptions; and
 (2) five members appointed by the governor who have
 expertise in or a demonstrated commitment to adoption issues.
 (c) The adoption review committee shall meet at least
 quarterly.
 (d) Not later than December 1, 2010, the Department of
 Family and Protective Services shall submit a written report of the
 results of the review conducted under Subsection (a) of this
 section to the governor, the lieutenant governor, the speaker of
 the house of representatives, the House Committee on Human
 Services, and the Senate Committee on Health and Human Services.
 The report must include:
 (1) a summary of the findings of the review conducted
 under Subsection (a) of this section;
 (2) a summary of the obstacles identified in the
 review that impede the department's ability to find permanent
 placements for foster children;
 (3) recommendations of actions the department should
 take to eliminate the obstacles described by Subdivision (2) of
 this subsection; and
 (4) any legislative recommendations that would
 improve the foster care system.
 SECTION 2. Not later than December 1, 2009, the executive
 commissioner of the Health and Human Services Commission and the
 governor shall appoint the members of the adoption review committee
 and the adoption review committee shall begin performing its duties
 as provided by this Act.
 SECTION 3. The adoption review committee is abolished and
 this Act expires September 1, 2011.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2225 was passed by the House on April
 28, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 147, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 2225 on May 25, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 0,
 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2225 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 21, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor