Senate | 05/23/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | ||
Senate | 05/22/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Posting rule suspended | Journal Page: 2716 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | Journal Page: 2390 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2390 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2312 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3441 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Record vote | RV#766 | Journal Page: 3236 |
House | 05/12/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3236 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3236 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Passed to engrossment as amended | Journal Page: 3167 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3167 | |
House | 05/11/2009 | Amended | 1-S. Turner | Journal Page: 3167 |
House | 05/11/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3167 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 2594 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/24/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/23/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1871 | |
House | 04/15/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/18/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs | Journal Page: 604 | |
House | 03/09/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 604 | |
House | 03/03/2009 | Filed |