House | 05/14/2009 | Postponed | 5/14/09 11:30 PM | Journal Page: 3662 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3662 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Point of order withdrawn | Rule 4, Section 32 | Journal Page: 3590 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3590 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Placed on Major State Calendar | ||
House | 05/12/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 05/11/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 05/11/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 05/11/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 3302 | |
House | 05/06/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 05/01/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/07/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/09/2009 | Referred to Public Health | Journal Page: 607 | |
House | 03/09/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 607 | |
House | 03/03/2009 | Filed |