Senate | 05/06/2009 | Referred to Agriculture & Rural Affairs | Journal Page: 2092 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2092 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1950 | |
House | 05/02/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2434 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2269 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Record vote | RV#471 | Journal Page: 2268 |
House | 05/01/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2268 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2268 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Constitutional three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2245 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2233 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2233 | |
House | 05/01/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1719 | |
House | 04/16/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 03/17/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/17/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/17/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/17/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/10/2009 | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism | Journal Page: 623 | |
House | 03/10/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 623 | |
House | 03/04/2009 | Filed |