E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on 9/1/09
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6979
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6977
|
Senate
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5153
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6895
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6975
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4422
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5379
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 5380
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1430
|
Journal Page: 5380
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5379
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5129
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3504
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3504
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3504
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3504
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3504
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3504
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3504
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
CA1 Ellis
|
Journal Page: 3504
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3504
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3504
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Reported favorably as amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec.
|
|
Journal Page: 2390
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2390
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2312
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3679
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3216
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#749
|
Journal Page: 3216
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3216
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3216
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 3188
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3188
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2553
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Referred to Transportation
|
|
Journal Page: 626
|
House
|
03/10/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 626
|
House
|
03/04/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|