1 | 1 | | 81R9719 MCK-D |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Vaught H.B. No. 2372 |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | |
---|
5 | 5 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
6 | 6 | | AN ACT |
---|
7 | 7 | | relating to the criteria for awarding certain medals to members of |
---|
8 | 8 | | the armed forces from Texas. |
---|
9 | 9 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
10 | 10 | | SECTION 1. Section 431.134(a), Government Code, as amended |
---|
11 | 11 | | by Chapters 740 (H.B. 2896), 741 (H.B. 2897), and 1080 (H.B. 2895), |
---|
12 | 12 | | Acts of the 80th Legislature, Regular Session, 2007, is reenacted |
---|
13 | 13 | | and amended to read as follows: |
---|
14 | 14 | | (a) The adjutant general may adopt rules and regulations |
---|
15 | 15 | | relating to the: |
---|
16 | 16 | | (1) Texas Faithful Service Medal, which shall be |
---|
17 | 17 | | awarded to a member of the state military forces who has completed |
---|
18 | 18 | | five years of honorable service during which the person has shown |
---|
19 | 19 | | fidelity to duty, efficient service, and great loyalty to the |
---|
20 | 20 | | state; |
---|
21 | 21 | | (2) Federal Service Medal, which shall be awarded to a |
---|
22 | 22 | | resident of the state [person] who served on active duty in the |
---|
23 | 23 | | United States armed forces [was inducted into federal service from |
---|
24 | 24 | | the state military forces between June 15, 1940, and January 1, |
---|
25 | 25 | | 1946, or after June 1, 1950, if the service was] for more than 60 |
---|
26 | 26 | | [90] days and received an honorable discharge; |
---|
27 | 27 | | (3) Texas Medal of Merit, which may be presented to a |
---|
28 | 28 | | member of the military forces of this state, another state, or the |
---|
29 | 29 | | United States who performs outstanding service or attains |
---|
30 | 30 | | extraordinary achievement in behalf of the state or United States; |
---|
31 | 31 | | (4) Texas Outstanding Service Medal, which may be |
---|
32 | 32 | | presented to a member of the military forces of this state, another |
---|
33 | 33 | | state, or the United States who has performed service in a superior |
---|
34 | 34 | | and clearly outstanding manner; |
---|
35 | 35 | | (5) Texas State Guard Service Medal, which shall be |
---|
36 | 36 | | awarded to a person who completes three consecutive years of |
---|
37 | 37 | | honorable service in the Texas State Guard during which the person |
---|
38 | 38 | | has shown fidelity to duty, efficient service, and great loyalty to |
---|
39 | 39 | | the state; |
---|
40 | 40 | | (6) Texas Desert Shield/Desert Storm Campaign Medal, |
---|
41 | 41 | | which shall be awarded to a person who was inducted into federal |
---|
42 | 42 | | service from the Texas National Guard after August 1, 1990, in |
---|
43 | 43 | | support of Operation Desert Shield or Operation Desert Storm, |
---|
44 | 44 | | without regard to the place that the person was deployed while |
---|
45 | 45 | | serving on active federal military duty; |
---|
46 | 46 | | (7) Texas Humanitarian Service Medal, which shall be |
---|
47 | 47 | | awarded to a person who: |
---|
48 | 48 | | (A) does not meet the criteria for an award of the |
---|
49 | 49 | | federal Humanitarian Service Medal; |
---|
50 | 50 | | (B) is a member of the state military forces; and |
---|
51 | 51 | | (C) while serving on state active duty or active |
---|
52 | 52 | | duty under state authority in accordance with Title 32 of the United |
---|
53 | 53 | | States Code, participates satisfactorily in defense support to a |
---|
54 | 54 | | mission under civilian authority to protect life or property during |
---|
55 | 55 | | or soon after a natural disaster or civil unrest in the state; |
---|
56 | 56 | | (8) Texas Cavalry Medal, which shall be awarded to a |
---|
57 | 57 | | person who: |
---|
58 | 58 | | (A) served on or after September 11, 2001, in the |
---|
59 | 59 | | 124th Cavalry, Texas Army National Guard; and |
---|
60 | 60 | | (B) served in a hostile fire zone as designated |
---|
61 | 61 | | by the United States secretary of defense; |
---|
62 | 62 | | (9) Texas Combat Service Ribbon, which shall be |
---|
63 | 63 | | awarded to a member of the Texas National Guard who served, after |
---|
64 | 64 | | September 11, 2001, in a hostile fire zone as designated by the |
---|
65 | 65 | | United States secretary of defense; |
---|
66 | 66 | | (10) Texas Purple Heart Medal, which shall be awarded |
---|
67 | 67 | | to a person who[, after September 11, 2001]: |
---|
68 | 68 | | (A) was inducted into federal service from the |
---|
69 | 69 | | Texas National Guard; and |
---|
70 | 70 | | (B) meets the criteria for an award of the |
---|
71 | 71 | | federal Purple Heart Medal; [and] |
---|
72 | 72 | | (11) Texas Superior Service Medal, which shall be |
---|
73 | 73 | | awarded to: |
---|
74 | 74 | | (A) a member of the state military forces who |
---|
75 | 75 | | has: |
---|
76 | 76 | | (i) completed 30 or more years of honorable |
---|
77 | 77 | | state service or a combination of state and federal service; and |
---|
78 | 78 | | (ii) continually demonstrated superior |
---|
79 | 79 | | performance and service while assigned to key leadership positions |
---|
80 | 80 | | demanding responsibility; or |
---|
81 | 81 | | (B) a civilian who has contributed significant |
---|
82 | 82 | | service to the state military forces; and |
---|
83 | 83 | | (12) [(11)] Texas Homeland Defense Service Medal, |
---|
84 | 84 | | which shall be awarded to a member of the state military forces who |
---|
85 | 85 | | served: |
---|
86 | 86 | | (A) on or after September 11, 2001; |
---|
87 | 87 | | (B) on state active duty or active duty under |
---|
88 | 88 | | state authority in accordance with Title 32 of the United States |
---|
89 | 89 | | Code; and |
---|
90 | 90 | | (C) satisfactorily in defense support to a |
---|
91 | 91 | | mission in the state under civilian authority. |
---|
92 | 92 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|