Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2372 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            81R9719 MCK-D
 By: Vaught H.B. No. 2372


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the criteria for awarding certain medals to members of
 the armed forces from Texas.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 431.134(a), Government Code, as amended
 by Chapters 740 (H.B. 2896), 741 (H.B. 2897), and 1080 (H.B. 2895),
 Acts of the 80th Legislature, Regular Session, 2007, is reenacted
 and amended to read as follows:
 (a) The adjutant general may adopt rules and regulations
 relating to the:
 (1) Texas Faithful Service Medal, which shall be
 awarded to a member of the state military forces who has completed
 five years of honorable service during which the person has shown
 fidelity to duty, efficient service, and great loyalty to the
 state;
 (2) Federal Service Medal, which shall be awarded to a
 resident of the state [person] who served on active duty in the
 United States armed forces [was inducted into federal service from
 the state military forces between June 15, 1940, and January 1,
 1946, or after June 1, 1950, if the service was] for more than 60
 [90] days and received an honorable discharge;
 (3) Texas Medal of Merit, which may be presented to a
 member of the military forces of this state, another state, or the
 United States who performs outstanding service or attains
 extraordinary achievement in behalf of the state or United States;
 (4) Texas Outstanding Service Medal, which may be
 presented to a member of the military forces of this state, another
 state, or the United States who has performed service in a superior
 and clearly outstanding manner;
 (5) Texas State Guard Service Medal, which shall be
 awarded to a person who completes three consecutive years of
 honorable service in the Texas State Guard during which the person
 has shown fidelity to duty, efficient service, and great loyalty to
 the state;
 (6) Texas Desert Shield/Desert Storm Campaign Medal,
 which shall be awarded to a person who was inducted into federal
 service from the Texas National Guard after August 1, 1990, in
 support of Operation Desert Shield or Operation Desert Storm,
 without regard to the place that the person was deployed while
 serving on active federal military duty;
 (7) Texas Humanitarian Service Medal, which shall be
 awarded to a person who:
 (A) does not meet the criteria for an award of the
 federal Humanitarian Service Medal;
 (B) is a member of the state military forces; and
 (C) while serving on state active duty or active
 duty under state authority in accordance with Title 32 of the United
 States Code, participates satisfactorily in defense support to a
 mission under civilian authority to protect life or property during
 or soon after a natural disaster or civil unrest in the state;
 (8) Texas Cavalry Medal, which shall be awarded to a
 person who:
 (A) served on or after September 11, 2001, in the
 124th Cavalry, Texas Army National Guard; and
 (B) served in a hostile fire zone as designated
 by the United States secretary of defense;
 (9) Texas Combat Service Ribbon, which shall be
 awarded to a member of the Texas National Guard who served, after
 September 11, 2001, in a hostile fire zone as designated by the
 United States secretary of defense;
 (10) Texas Purple Heart Medal, which shall be awarded
 to a person who[, after September 11, 2001]:
 (A) was inducted into federal service from the
 Texas National Guard; and
 (B) meets the criteria for an award of the
 federal Purple Heart Medal; [and]
 (11) Texas Superior Service Medal, which shall be
 awarded to:
 (A) a member of the state military forces who
 has:
 (i) completed 30 or more years of honorable
 state service or a combination of state and federal service; and
 (ii) continually demonstrated superior
 performance and service while assigned to key leadership positions
 demanding responsibility; or
 (B) a civilian who has contributed significant
 service to the state military forces; and
 (12) [(11)] Texas Homeland Defense Service Medal,
 which shall be awarded to a member of the state military forces who
 served:
 (A) on or after September 11, 2001;
 (B) on state active duty or active duty under
 state authority in accordance with Title 32 of the United States
 Code; and
 (C) satisfactorily in defense support to a
 mission in the state under civilian authority.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.