House | 05/14/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3660 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Record vote | RV#868 | Journal Page: 3659 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Motion to reconsider and table prevails | Journal Page: 3659 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Failed to pass to engrossment | Journal Page: 3658 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Amended | 1-Fletcher | Journal Page: 3658 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Point of order overruled | . | Journal Page: 3657 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Laid out as postponed business | Journal Page: 3657 | |
House | 05/14/2009 | Postponed | 5/14/09 8:30 PM | Journal Page: 3642 |
House | 05/14/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3642 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1719 | |
House | 04/16/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/16/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/11/2009 | Referred to Public Safety | Journal Page: 640 | |
House | 03/11/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 640 | |
House | 03/04/2009 | Filed |