House | 04/21/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1662 | |
House | 03/26/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/26/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/11/2009 | Referred to Urban Affairs | Journal Page: 640 | |
House | 03/11/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 640 | |
House | 03/04/2009 | Filed |