E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6979
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6977
|
Senate
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5153
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6895
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6975
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4475
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5559
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1458
|
Journal Page: 5560
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5559
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5129
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3505
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3505
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3505
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3505
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3505
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3505
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3505
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 2390
|
Senate
|
05/14/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2390
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2312
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3679
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#749
|
Journal Page: 3216
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3216
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3216
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3189
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Menendez, Anchia, Morrison, Thompson, Gutierrez, and Orr
|
Journal Page: 3189
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3189
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2870
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Considered in formal meeting
|
|
|
House
|
05/04/2009
|
Scheduled for formal meeting on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2009
|
Referred to Higher Education
|
|
Journal Page: 641
|
House
|
03/11/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 641
|
House
|
03/04/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|