Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2425 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 2425


 AN ACT
 relating to engineering recruitment programs at public or private
 institutions of higher education and to certain degree programs at
 public junior colleges.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 61.791(a), Education Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a) The board shall establish and administer, using funds
 appropriated for that purpose, a one-week summer program to take
 place on the campus of each general academic teaching institution
 or private or independent institution of higher education that
 offers an engineering degree program. The summer program must be
 designed for middle and high school students and to expose those
 students to math, science, and engineering concepts that a student
 in an engineering degree program may encounter.
 SECTION 2. Sections 61.792(a) and (b), Education Code, are
 amended to read as follows:
 (a) The board shall establish and administer, using funds
 appropriated for that purpose, scholarships for students pursuing a
 degree in engineering at a general academic teaching institution or
 a private or independent institution of higher education.
 (b) To qualify for a scholarship under this section, a
 student must:
 (1) have graduated with a grade point average in the
 top 20 percent of the student's high school graduating class;
 (2) have graduated from high school with a grade point
 average of at least 3.5 on a four-point scale or the equivalent in
 mathematics and science courses offered under the recommended or
 advanced high school program under Section 28.025(a); and
 (3) maintain an overall grade point average of at
 least 3.0 on a four-point scale at the general academic teaching
 institution or the private or independent institution of higher
 education in which the student is enrolled.
 SECTION 3. Section 130.0012, Education Code, is amended by
 adding Subsection (k) to read as follows:
 (k)  The board shall conduct a study relating to the success
 of baccalaureate degree programs offered under this section and to
 the feasibility of expanding the offering of baccalaureate degrees
 by public junior colleges. The study must consider the economic
 viability of expanding the degree programs, the workforce needs
 served by the degree programs for various areas of the state,
 current and potential university course offerings, and other
 methods for making baccalaureate degrees available, such as
 distance education programs and multi-institutional teaching
 centers. Not later than November 15, 2010, the board shall report
 the results of the study to each standing committee of the
 legislature with primary jurisdiction over higher education.  This
 subsection expires January 1, 2011.
 SECTION 4. (a) Sections 61.791 and 61.792, Education Code,
 as amended by this Act, apply beginning with the 2009-2010 academic
 year.
 (b) The Texas Higher Education Coordinating Board shall
 adopt rules for the administration of Sections 61.791 and 61.792,
 Education Code, as amended by this Act, as soon as practicable after
 this Act takes effect. For that purpose, the coordinating board may
 adopt the rules in the manner provided by law for emergency rules.
 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2425 was passed by the House on May
 12, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 149, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 2425 on May 29, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 142, Nays 0,
 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2425 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor