1 | 1 | | H.B. No. 2450 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to the administration of programs by the Texas Department |
---|
6 | 6 | | of Housing and Community Affairs in response to or in preparation |
---|
7 | 7 | | for a natural disaster. |
---|
8 | 8 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
9 | 9 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter H, Chapter 2306, Government Code, is |
---|
10 | 10 | | amended by adding Section 2306.188 to read as follows: |
---|
11 | 11 | | Sec. 2306.188. ESTABLISHING HOME OWNERSHIP IN DISASTER |
---|
12 | 12 | | AREA. (a) An applicant for federally provided financial |
---|
13 | 13 | | assistance administered by the department to repair or rebuild a |
---|
14 | 14 | | home damaged by a natural disaster may establish ownership of the |
---|
15 | 15 | | home through nontraditional documentation of title. The department |
---|
16 | 16 | | shall process an application for that assistance as if the |
---|
17 | 17 | | applicant is the record title holder of the affected real property |
---|
18 | 18 | | if the applicant provides to the department: |
---|
19 | 19 | | (1) on a form prescribed by the department, an |
---|
20 | 20 | | affidavit summarizing the basis on which the applicant claims to be |
---|
21 | 21 | | the holder of record title or, if applicable, a successor in |
---|
22 | 22 | | interest to the holder of record title and stating that: |
---|
23 | 23 | | (A) there is no other person entitled to claim |
---|
24 | 24 | | any ownership interest in the property; or |
---|
25 | 25 | | (B) each person who may be entitled to claim an |
---|
26 | 26 | | ownership interest in the property has given consent to the |
---|
27 | 27 | | application or cannot be located after a reasonable effort; and |
---|
28 | 28 | | (2) other documentation, including tax receipts, |
---|
29 | 29 | | utility bills, or evidence of insurance for the home, that |
---|
30 | 30 | | indicates that the applicant exercised ownership over the property |
---|
31 | 31 | | at the time of the natural disaster. |
---|
32 | 32 | | (b) This section does not establish record ownership or |
---|
33 | 33 | | otherwise alter legal ownership of real property. |
---|
34 | 34 | | (c) The department is not liable to any claimed owner of an |
---|
35 | 35 | | interest in real property for administering financial assistance as |
---|
36 | 36 | | permitted by this section. |
---|
37 | 37 | | SECTION 2. Chapter 2306, Government Code, is amended by |
---|
38 | 38 | | adding Subchapter X-2 to read as follows: |
---|
39 | 39 | | SUBCHAPTER X-2. NATURAL DISASTER HOUSING RECONSTRUCTION |
---|
40 | 40 | | INITIATIVE |
---|
41 | 41 | | Sec. 2306.541. NATURAL DISASTER HOUSING RECONSTRUCTION |
---|
42 | 42 | | ADVISORY COMMITTEE. (a) The director shall appoint a natural |
---|
43 | 43 | | disaster housing reconstruction advisory committee composed of |
---|
44 | 44 | | representatives from appropriate local, state, and federal |
---|
45 | 45 | | entities and organizations and nonprofit organizations. |
---|
46 | 46 | | (b) The advisory committee shall develop a natural disaster |
---|
47 | 47 | | housing reconstruction plan. In developing this plan, the advisory |
---|
48 | 48 | | committee shall: |
---|
49 | 49 | | (1) evaluate existing systems of providing temporary |
---|
50 | 50 | | housing to victims of natural disasters and develop alternative |
---|
51 | 51 | | systems to increase efficiency and cost-effectiveness; |
---|
52 | 52 | | (2) evaluate existing models for providing permanent |
---|
53 | 53 | | replacement housing to victims of natural disasters; |
---|
54 | 54 | | (3) design alternatives to existing models to improve |
---|
55 | 55 | | the sustainability, affordability, desirability, and quality of |
---|
56 | 56 | | housing rebuilt in the event of future natural disasters; |
---|
57 | 57 | | (4) evaluate economic circumstances of elderly, |
---|
58 | 58 | | disabled, and low-income victims of natural disasters and develop |
---|
59 | 59 | | models for providing affordable replacement housing; |
---|
60 | 60 | | (5) recommend programs for the rapid and efficient |
---|
61 | 61 | | large-scale production of temporary and permanent replacement |
---|
62 | 62 | | housing following a natural disaster; and |
---|
63 | 63 | | (6) encourage the participation, coordination, and |
---|
64 | 64 | | involvement of appropriate federal organizations. |
---|
65 | 65 | | (c) Chapter 2110 does not apply to the advisory committee. |
---|
66 | 66 | | Sec. 2306.542. HOUSING RECONSTRUCTION DEMONSTRATION PILOT |
---|
67 | 67 | | PROGRAM. (a) Using the natural disaster housing reconstruction |
---|
68 | 68 | | plan developed under this subchapter, the director and advisory |
---|
69 | 69 | | committee shall develop, for implementation under Subsections (b) |
---|
70 | 70 | | and (c), housing reconstruction demonstration pilot programs for |
---|
71 | 71 | | three areas, each of which was affected by one of the three most |
---|
72 | 72 | | recent federally declared natural disasters. The pilot programs |
---|
73 | 73 | | must provide for the replacement of at least 20 houses in each area |
---|
74 | 74 | | to test the feasibility of implementing the plan in the large-scale |
---|
75 | 75 | | production of replacement housing for victims of federally declared |
---|
76 | 76 | | natural disasters. |
---|
77 | 77 | | (b) The department shall provide to an interested council of |
---|
78 | 78 | | government, county, or local government eligible for funding for |
---|
79 | 79 | | disaster recovery under the community development block grant |
---|
80 | 80 | | program: |
---|
81 | 81 | | (1) information regarding a pilot program developed |
---|
82 | 82 | | under Subsection (a); and |
---|
83 | 83 | | (2) assistance in implementing a pilot program |
---|
84 | 84 | | developed under Subsection (a). |
---|
85 | 85 | | (c) At the discretion of the board, the department may |
---|
86 | 86 | | implement a pilot program in any of the three most recently |
---|
87 | 87 | | federally declared disaster areas in which a pilot program has not |
---|
88 | 88 | | been implemented by a council of government, county, or local |
---|
89 | 89 | | government. The department may use any available funds to |
---|
90 | 90 | | implement the pilot program. |
---|
91 | 91 | | SECTION 3. The purpose of this Act in adding Subchapter X-2, |
---|
92 | 92 | | Chapter 2306, Government Code, is to encourage the development of a |
---|
93 | 93 | | model plan for future reconstruction efforts to increase the |
---|
94 | 94 | | effective and efficient delivery of natural disaster housing |
---|
95 | 95 | | recovery services by state agencies. This Act is not meant to delay |
---|
96 | 96 | | or otherwise interfere with ongoing reconstruction efforts. |
---|
97 | 97 | | SECTION 4. (a) Not later than January 1, 2010, the |
---|
98 | 98 | | executive director of the Texas Department of Housing and Community |
---|
99 | 99 | | Affairs shall submit the natural disaster housing reconstruction |
---|
100 | 100 | | plan developed under Subsection (b), Section 2306.541, Government |
---|
101 | 101 | | Code, as added by this Act, to the governing board of the Texas |
---|
102 | 102 | | Department of Housing and Community Affairs. |
---|
103 | 103 | | (b) Not later than March 1, 2010, the executive director of |
---|
104 | 104 | | the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs shall provide |
---|
105 | 105 | | housing reconstruction demonstration pilot program information to |
---|
106 | 106 | | an interested council of government, county, or local government |
---|
107 | 107 | | eligible for funding for disaster recovery under the community |
---|
108 | 108 | | development block grant program. |
---|
109 | 109 | | SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
110 | 110 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
111 | 111 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
112 | 112 | | I certify that H.B. No. 2450 was passed by the House on April |
---|
113 | 113 | | 28, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 148, Nays 1, 1 present, not |
---|
114 | 114 | | voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B. |
---|
115 | 115 | | No. 2450 on May 29, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 0, |
---|
116 | 116 | | 2 present, not voting. |
---|
117 | 117 | | ______________________________ |
---|
118 | 118 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
119 | 119 | | I certify that H.B. No. 2450 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
120 | 120 | | amendments, on May 26, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
121 | 121 | | 0. |
---|
122 | 122 | | ______________________________ |
---|
123 | 123 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
124 | 124 | | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
125 | 125 | | Date |
---|
126 | 126 | | __________________ |
---|
127 | 127 | | Governor |
---|