Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2450 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 2450


 AN ACT
 relating to the administration of programs by the Texas Department
 of Housing and Community Affairs in response to or in preparation
 for a natural disaster.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter H, Chapter 2306, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 2306.188 to read as follows:
 Sec. 2306.188.  ESTABLISHING HOME OWNERSHIP IN DISASTER
 AREA. (a) An applicant for federally provided financial
 assistance administered by the department to repair or rebuild a
 home damaged by a natural disaster may establish ownership of the
 home through nontraditional documentation of title. The department
 shall process an application for that assistance as if the
 applicant is the record title holder of the affected real property
 if the applicant provides to the department:
 (1)  on a form prescribed by the department, an
 affidavit summarizing the basis on which the applicant claims to be
 the holder of record title or, if applicable, a successor in
 interest to the holder of record title and stating that:
 (A)  there is no other person entitled to claim
 any ownership interest in the property; or
 (B)  each person who may be entitled to claim an
 ownership interest in the property has given consent to the
 application or cannot be located after a reasonable effort; and
 (2)  other documentation, including tax receipts,
 utility bills, or evidence of insurance for the home, that
 indicates that the applicant exercised ownership over the property
 at the time of the natural disaster.
 (b)  This section does not establish record ownership or
 otherwise alter legal ownership of real property.
 (c)  The department is not liable to any claimed owner of an
 interest in real property for administering financial assistance as
 permitted by this section.
 SECTION 2. Chapter 2306, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter X-2 to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER X-2.  NATURAL DISASTER HOUSING RECONSTRUCTION
 INITIATIVE
 Sec. 2306.541.  NATURAL DISASTER HOUSING RECONSTRUCTION
 ADVISORY COMMITTEE.  (a)  The director shall appoint a natural
 disaster housing reconstruction advisory committee composed of
 representatives from appropriate local, state, and federal
 entities and organizations and nonprofit organizations.
 (b)  The advisory committee shall develop a natural disaster
 housing reconstruction plan.  In developing this plan, the advisory
 committee shall:
 (1)  evaluate existing systems of providing temporary
 housing to victims of natural disasters and develop alternative
 systems to increase efficiency and cost-effectiveness;
 (2)  evaluate existing models for providing permanent
 replacement housing to victims of natural disasters;
 (3)  design alternatives to existing models to improve
 the sustainability, affordability, desirability, and quality of
 housing rebuilt in the event of future natural disasters;
 (4)  evaluate economic circumstances of elderly,
 disabled, and low-income victims of natural disasters and develop
 models for providing affordable replacement housing;
 (5)  recommend programs for the rapid and efficient
 large-scale production of temporary and permanent replacement
 housing following a natural disaster; and
 (6)  encourage the participation, coordination, and
 involvement of appropriate federal organizations.
 (c) Chapter 2110 does not apply to the advisory committee.
 Sec. 2306.542.  HOUSING RECONSTRUCTION DEMONSTRATION PILOT
 PROGRAM.  (a)  Using the natural disaster housing reconstruction
 plan developed under this subchapter, the director and advisory
 committee shall develop, for implementation under Subsections (b)
 and (c), housing reconstruction demonstration pilot programs for
 three areas, each of which was affected by one of the three most
 recent federally declared natural disasters.  The pilot programs
 must provide for the replacement of at least 20 houses in each area
 to test the feasibility of implementing the plan in the large-scale
 production of replacement housing for victims of federally declared
 natural disasters.
 (b)  The department shall provide to an interested council of
 government, county, or local government eligible for funding for
 disaster recovery under the community development block grant
 program:
 (1)  information regarding a pilot program developed
 under Subsection (a); and
 (2)  assistance in implementing a pilot program
 developed under Subsection (a).
 (c)  At the discretion of the board, the department may
 implement a pilot program in any of the three most recently
 federally declared disaster areas in which a pilot program has not
 been implemented by a council of government, county, or local
 government.  The department may use any available funds to
 implement the pilot program.
 SECTION 3. The purpose of this Act in adding Subchapter X-2,
 Chapter 2306, Government Code, is to encourage the development of a
 model plan for future reconstruction efforts to increase the
 effective and efficient delivery of natural disaster housing
 recovery services by state agencies. This Act is not meant to delay
 or otherwise interfere with ongoing reconstruction efforts.
 SECTION 4. (a) Not later than January 1, 2010, the
 executive director of the Texas Department of Housing and Community
 Affairs shall submit the natural disaster housing reconstruction
 plan developed under Subsection (b), Section 2306.541, Government
 Code, as added by this Act, to the governing board of the Texas
 Department of Housing and Community Affairs.
 (b) Not later than March 1, 2010, the executive director of
 the Texas Department of Housing and Community Affairs shall provide
 housing reconstruction demonstration pilot program information to
 an interested council of government, county, or local government
 eligible for funding for disaster recovery under the community
 development block grant program.
 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2450 was passed by the House on April
 28, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 148, Nays 1, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 2450 on May 29, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 0,
 2 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2450 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 26, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor