Senate | 05/25/2009 | No action taken in committee | ||
Senate | 05/25/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Tagged | ||
Senate | 05/23/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Referred to Finance | Journal Page: 1995 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1995 | |
Senate | 04/29/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1719 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2136 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2004 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Record vote | RV#347 | Journal Page: 1960 |
House | 04/28/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1960 | |
House | 04/28/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1960 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1899 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1899 | |
House | 04/27/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/24/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/18/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/17/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1601 | |
House | 04/08/2009 | Reported favorably as substituted | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Committee substitute considered in committee | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Considered in formal meeting | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/11/2009 | Referred to Public Safety | Journal Page: 648 | |
House | 03/11/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 648 | |
House | 03/05/2009 | Filed |