E | 05/27/2009 | Effective on 9/1/09 | ||
E | 05/27/2009 | Signed by the Governor | Journal Page: 5217 | |
E | 05/19/2009 | Sent to the Governor | Journal Page: 4221 | |
Senate | 05/19/2009 | Signed in the Senate | Journal Page: 2534 | |
House | 05/19/2009 | Signed in the House | Journal Page: 3970 | |
House | 05/18/2009 | Reported enrolled | Journal Page: 4079 | |
House | 05/15/2009 | Senate passage reported | Journal Page: 3718 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2417 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2417 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Record vote | Journal Page: 2417 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Three day rule suspended | Journal Page: 2417 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2416 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Passed to 3rd reading | Journal Page: 2416 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Amendment withdrawn | Journal Page: 2416 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Point of order withdrawn | Journal Page: 2416 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Point of order | Journal Page: 2416 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Amendment(s) offered | FA1 West | Journal Page: 2416 |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2416 | |
Senate | 05/15/2009 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | Journal Page: 2416 | |
Senate | 05/13/2009 | Placed on intent calendar | ||
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | Journal Page: 2096 | |
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
Senate | 05/04/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 1658 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1658 | |
Senate | 04/14/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 997 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1207 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Record vote | RV#144 | Journal Page: 1174 |
House | 04/09/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1174 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1174 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1168 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1168 | |
House | 04/09/2009 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | ||
House | 04/06/2009 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 03/30/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1014 | |
House | 03/25/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/25/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/11/2009 | Referred to Licensing & Administrative Procedures | Journal Page: 648 | |
House | 03/11/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 648 | |
House | 03/05/2009 | Filed |