Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2509 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Geren (Senate Sponsor - Wentworth) H.B. No. 2509
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 14, 2009;
 April 27, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on State
 Affairs; May 6, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote:
 Yeas 9, Nays 0; May 6, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the payment of a lottery prize awarded to a minor.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Sections 466.405(b) and (e), Government Code,
 are amended to read as follows:
 (b) If a minor is entitled to prize money on a winning ticket
 in an amount of $600 or more, the director may direct payment to the
 minor by depositing the amount of the prize in any financial
 institution [bank] to the credit of an adult member of the minor's
 family or of the minor's guardian as custodian for the minor.
 (e) In this section:
 (1)  "Adult" means an individual who is at least 18
 years of age.
 (2) "Custodian," "financial institution," [, "adult,"
 "bank," "custodian,"] "guardian," and "member of the [a] minor's
 family," [and "minor"] have the meanings assigned by Section
 141.002, Property Code.
 (3)  "Minor" means an individual who is younger than 18
 years of age.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *