1 | 1 | | H.B. No. 2529 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to the terms of office of commissioners of certain |
---|
6 | 6 | | emergency services districts. |
---|
7 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 8 | | SECTION 1. Sections 775.0345(b), (h), and (i), Health and |
---|
9 | 9 | | Safety Code, are amended to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 10 | | (b) The governing body of a district consists of a |
---|
11 | 11 | | five-person board of emergency services commissioners elected as |
---|
12 | 12 | | prescribed by this section. Except as provided by Subsection (h), |
---|
13 | 13 | | emergency services commissioners serve four-year [two-year] terms. |
---|
14 | 14 | | (h) The initial emergency services commissioners' terms of |
---|
15 | 15 | | office begin 30 days after canvassing of the election results. The |
---|
16 | 16 | | two commissioners who received the fewest votes serve a term that |
---|
17 | 17 | | expires on December 31 of the second year following the year in |
---|
18 | 18 | | which the election was held. The other emergency services |
---|
19 | 19 | | commissioners serve terms that expire on December 31 of the fourth |
---|
20 | 20 | | year following the year in which the election was held. |
---|
21 | 21 | | (i) The board shall hold the general election for |
---|
22 | 22 | | commissioner every two years [annually] on an authorized uniform |
---|
23 | 23 | | election date as provided by Chapter 41, Election Code. The board |
---|
24 | 24 | | may change the election date from one authorized election date to |
---|
25 | 25 | | another authorized election date and shall adjust the terms of |
---|
26 | 26 | | office to conform to the new election date. |
---|
27 | 27 | | SECTION 2. Sections 775.035(a), (g), and (h), Health and |
---|
28 | 28 | | Safety Code, are amended to read as follows: |
---|
29 | 29 | | (a) The governing body of a district located in more than |
---|
30 | 30 | | one county consists of a five-person board of emergency services |
---|
31 | 31 | | commissioners elected as prescribed by this section. Except as |
---|
32 | 32 | | provided by Subsection (g), emergency services commissioners serve |
---|
33 | 33 | | four-year [two-year] terms. |
---|
34 | 34 | | (g) The initial emergency services commissioners' terms of |
---|
35 | 35 | | office begin 30 days after canvassing of the election results. The |
---|
36 | 36 | | two commissioners who received the fewest votes serve a term that |
---|
37 | 37 | | expires on December 31 of the second year following the year in |
---|
38 | 38 | | which the election was held. The other emergency services |
---|
39 | 39 | | commissioners serve terms that expire on December 31 of the fourth |
---|
40 | 40 | | year following the year in which the election was held. |
---|
41 | 41 | | (h) The general election for commissioner shall be held |
---|
42 | 42 | | every two years [annually] on an authorized uniform election date |
---|
43 | 43 | | as provided by Chapter 41, Election Code. The board may change the |
---|
44 | 44 | | election date from one authorized election date to another |
---|
45 | 45 | | authorized election date and shall adjust the terms of office to |
---|
46 | 46 | | conform to the new election date. |
---|
47 | 47 | | SECTION 3. (a) The changes in law made by this Act do not |
---|
48 | 48 | | affect the entitlement of a person who is a commissioner serving on |
---|
49 | 49 | | an emergency services board immediately before the effective date |
---|
50 | 50 | | of this Act to continue to carry out the board's functions for the |
---|
51 | 51 | | remainder of the commissioner's term. |
---|
52 | 52 | | (b) This Act does not prohibit a person who is serving as a |
---|
53 | 53 | | commissioner on or after the effective date of this Act from: |
---|
54 | 54 | | (1) running for election to the board if the person has |
---|
55 | 55 | | qualifications required for a board member under Section 775.0345 |
---|
56 | 56 | | or 775.035, Health and Safety Code, as amended by this Act; or |
---|
57 | 57 | | (2) continuing to serve until the election and |
---|
58 | 58 | | qualification of a new commissioner for that commissioner's |
---|
59 | 59 | | position. |
---|
60 | 60 | | (c) Sections 775.0345 and 775.035, Health and Safety Code, |
---|
61 | 61 | | as amended by this Act, govern all elections held after December 31, |
---|
62 | 62 | | 2009. An emergency services commissioner elected at any election |
---|
63 | 63 | | held between July 1, 2007, and December 31, 2007, shall serve until |
---|
64 | 64 | | the November 2009 election. Commissioners elected at any election |
---|
65 | 65 | | between January 1, 2008, and June 30, 2008, shall serve until the |
---|
66 | 66 | | May 2010 election. Commissioners elected at any election held |
---|
67 | 67 | | between July 1, 2008, and December 31, 2008, shall serve until the |
---|
68 | 68 | | November 2010 election. Commissioners elected at any election held |
---|
69 | 69 | | between January 1, 2009, and June 30, 2009, shall serve until the |
---|
70 | 70 | | May 2012 election. Commissioners elected between July 1, 2009, and |
---|
71 | 71 | | December 31, 2009, shall serve until the November 2012 election. |
---|
72 | 72 | | SECTION 4. This Act takes effect January 1, 2010, but only |
---|
73 | 73 | | if the constitutional amendment proposed by the 81st Legislature, |
---|
74 | 74 | | Regular Session, 2009, to allow the legislature to provide for |
---|
75 | 75 | | members of a governing board of an emergency services district to |
---|
76 | 76 | | serve terms not to exceed four years is approved by the voters. If |
---|
77 | 77 | | that amendment is not approved by the voters, this Act has no |
---|
78 | 78 | | effect. |
---|
79 | 79 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
80 | 80 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
81 | 81 | | I certify that H.B. No. 2529 was passed by the House on April |
---|
82 | 82 | | 30, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, 1 present, not |
---|
83 | 83 | | voting. |
---|
84 | 84 | | ______________________________ |
---|
85 | 85 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
86 | 86 | | I certify that H.B. No. 2529 was passed by the Senate on May |
---|
87 | 87 | | 21, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
88 | 88 | | ______________________________ |
---|
89 | 89 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
90 | 90 | | APPROVED: _____________________ |
---|
91 | 91 | | Date |
---|
92 | 92 | | _____________________ |
---|
93 | 93 | | Governor |
---|