Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2529 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 2529


 AN ACT
 relating to the terms of office of commissioners of certain
 emergency services districts.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Sections 775.0345(b), (h), and (i), Health and
 Safety Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (b) The governing body of a district consists of a
 five-person board of emergency services commissioners elected as
 prescribed by this section. Except as provided by Subsection (h),
 emergency services commissioners serve four-year [two-year] terms.
 (h) The initial emergency services commissioners' terms of
 office begin 30 days after canvassing of the election results. The
 two commissioners who received the fewest votes serve a term that
 expires on December 31 of the second year following the year in
 which the election was held. The other emergency services
 commissioners serve terms that expire on December 31 of the fourth
 year following the year in which the election was held.
 (i) The board shall hold the general election for
 commissioner every two years [annually] on an authorized uniform
 election date as provided by Chapter 41, Election Code. The board
 may change the election date from one authorized election date to
 another authorized election date and shall adjust the terms of
 office to conform to the new election date.
 SECTION 2. Sections 775.035(a), (g), and (h), Health and
 Safety Code, are amended to read as follows:
 (a) The governing body of a district located in more than
 one county consists of a five-person board of emergency services
 commissioners elected as prescribed by this section. Except as
 provided by Subsection (g), emergency services commissioners serve
 four-year [two-year] terms.
 (g) The initial emergency services commissioners' terms of
 office begin 30 days after canvassing of the election results. The
 two commissioners who received the fewest votes serve a term that
 expires on December 31 of the second year following the year in
 which the election was held. The other emergency services
 commissioners serve terms that expire on December 31 of the fourth
 year following the year in which the election was held.
 (h) The general election for commissioner shall be held
 every two years [annually] on an authorized uniform election date
 as provided by Chapter 41, Election Code. The board may change the
 election date from one authorized election date to another
 authorized election date and shall adjust the terms of office to
 conform to the new election date.
 SECTION 3. (a) The changes in law made by this Act do not
 affect the entitlement of a person who is a commissioner serving on
 an emergency services board immediately before the effective date
 of this Act to continue to carry out the board's functions for the
 remainder of the commissioner's term.
 (b) This Act does not prohibit a person who is serving as a
 commissioner on or after the effective date of this Act from:
 (1) running for election to the board if the person has
 qualifications required for a board member under Section 775.0345
 or 775.035, Health and Safety Code, as amended by this Act; or
 (2) continuing to serve until the election and
 qualification of a new commissioner for that commissioner's
 position.
 (c) Sections 775.0345 and 775.035, Health and Safety Code,
 as amended by this Act, govern all elections held after December 31,
 2009. An emergency services commissioner elected at any election
 held between July 1, 2007, and December 31, 2007, shall serve until
 the November 2009 election. Commissioners elected at any election
 between January 1, 2008, and June 30, 2008, shall serve until the
 May 2010 election. Commissioners elected at any election held
 between July 1, 2008, and December 31, 2008, shall serve until the
 November 2010 election. Commissioners elected at any election held
 between January 1, 2009, and June 30, 2009, shall serve until the
 May 2012 election. Commissioners elected between July 1, 2009, and
 December 31, 2009, shall serve until the November 2012 election.
 SECTION 4. This Act takes effect January 1, 2010, but only
 if the constitutional amendment proposed by the 81st Legislature,
 Regular Session, 2009, to allow the legislature to provide for
 members of a governing board of an emergency services district to
 serve terms not to exceed four years is approved by the voters. If
 that amendment is not approved by the voters, this Act has no
 effect.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2529 was passed by the House on April
 30, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2529 was passed by the Senate on May
 21, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: _____________________
 Date
 _____________________
 Governor