1 | 1 | | H.B. No. 2531 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to a reporting requirement regarding the Texas emerging |
---|
6 | 6 | | technology fund. |
---|
7 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 8 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 490, Government Code, is |
---|
9 | 9 | | amended by adding Section 490.005 to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 10 | | Sec. 490.005. ANNUAL REPORT. (a) Not later than January 1 |
---|
11 | 11 | | of each year, the governor shall submit to the legislature and post |
---|
12 | 12 | | on the office of the governor's Internet website a report that |
---|
13 | 13 | | includes the following information regarding the fund for the |
---|
14 | 14 | | preceding three state fiscal years: |
---|
15 | 15 | | (1) the total number and amount of awards made; |
---|
16 | 16 | | (2) the number and amount of awards made under |
---|
17 | 17 | | Subchapters D, E, and F; |
---|
18 | 18 | | (3) the aggregate total of private sector investment, |
---|
19 | 19 | | federal government funding, and contributions from other sources |
---|
20 | 20 | | obtained in connection with awards made under each of the |
---|
21 | 21 | | subchapters listed in Subdivision (2); |
---|
22 | 22 | | (4) the name of each award recipient and the amount of |
---|
23 | 23 | | the award made to the recipient; and |
---|
24 | 24 | | (5) a brief description of the equity position that |
---|
25 | 25 | | the governor, on behalf of the state, may take in companies |
---|
26 | 26 | | receiving awards and the names of the companies in which the state |
---|
27 | 27 | | has taken an equity position. |
---|
28 | 28 | | (b) The annual report must also contain a brief description |
---|
29 | 29 | | regarding: |
---|
30 | 30 | | (1) the intended outcomes of projects funded under |
---|
31 | 31 | | Subchapter D during the preceding two state fiscal years; and |
---|
32 | 32 | | (2) the actual outcomes of all projects funded under |
---|
33 | 33 | | Subchapter D during the fund's existence, including any financial |
---|
34 | 34 | | impact on the state resulting from a liquidity event involving a |
---|
35 | 35 | | company whose project was funded under that subchapter. |
---|
36 | 36 | | (c) The report may not include information that is made |
---|
37 | 37 | | confidential by law. |
---|
38 | 38 | | SECTION 2. Not later than January 1, 2011, the governor |
---|
39 | 39 | | shall submit the initial report required by Section 490.005, |
---|
40 | 40 | | Government Code, as added by this Act. |
---|
41 | 41 | | SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
42 | 42 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
43 | 43 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
44 | 44 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
45 | 45 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
46 | 46 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
47 | 47 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
48 | 48 | | I certify that H.B. No. 2531 was passed by the House on May 4, |
---|
49 | 49 | | 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 142, Nays 0, 1 present, not |
---|
50 | 50 | | voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to |
---|
51 | 51 | | H.B. No. 2531 on May 28, 2009, and requested the appointment of a |
---|
52 | 52 | | conference committee to consider the differences between the two |
---|
53 | 53 | | houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report |
---|
54 | 54 | | on H.B. No. 2531 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 142, |
---|
55 | 55 | | Nays 0, 1 present, not voting. |
---|
56 | 56 | | ______________________________ |
---|
57 | 57 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
58 | 58 | | I certify that H.B. No. 2531 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
59 | 59 | | amendments, on May 22, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays |
---|
60 | 60 | | 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference |
---|
61 | 61 | | committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and |
---|
62 | 62 | | that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. |
---|
63 | 63 | | 2531 on June 1, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
64 | 64 | | ______________________________ |
---|
65 | 65 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
66 | 66 | | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
67 | 67 | | Date |
---|
68 | 68 | | __________________ |
---|
69 | 69 | | Governor |
---|