Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2531 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 2531


 AN ACT
 relating to a reporting requirement regarding the Texas emerging
 technology fund.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 490, Government Code, is
 amended by adding Section 490.005 to read as follows:
 Sec. 490.005.  ANNUAL REPORT. (a)  Not later than January 1
 of each year, the governor shall submit to the legislature and post
 on the office of the governor's Internet website a report that
 includes the following information regarding the fund for the
 preceding three state fiscal years:
 (1) the total number and amount of awards made;
 (2)  the number and amount of awards made under
 Subchapters D, E, and F;
 (3)  the aggregate total of private sector investment,
 federal government funding, and contributions from other sources
 obtained in connection with awards made under each of the
 subchapters listed in Subdivision (2);
 (4)  the name of each award recipient and the amount of
 the award made to the recipient; and
 (5)  a brief description of the equity position that
 the governor, on behalf of the state, may take in companies
 receiving awards and the names of the companies in which the state
 has taken an equity position.
 (b)  The annual report must also contain a brief description
 regarding:
 (1)  the intended outcomes of projects funded under
 Subchapter D during the preceding two state fiscal years; and
 (2)  the actual outcomes of all projects funded under
 Subchapter D during the fund's existence, including any financial
 impact on the state resulting from a liquidity event involving a
 company whose project was funded under that subchapter.
 (c)  The report may not include information that is made
 confidential by law.
 SECTION 2. Not later than January 1, 2011, the governor
 shall submit the initial report required by Section 490.005,
 Government Code, as added by this Act.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2531 was passed by the House on May 4,
 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 142, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 2531 on May 28, 2009, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 2531 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 142,
 Nays 0, 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2531 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 22, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 30, Nays
 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 2531 on June 1, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor