Senate | 04/27/2009 | Referred to Transportation & Homeland Sec. | Journal Page: 1659 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 1659 | |
Senate | 04/27/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 1631 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 1930 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Record vote | RV#280 | Journal Page: 1787 |
House | 04/24/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 1787 | |
House | 04/24/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 1787 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 1753 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 1753 | |
House | 04/23/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/14/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1186 | |
House | 03/31/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 03/31/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 03/24/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/11/2009 | Referred to Transportation | Journal Page: 652 | |
House | 03/11/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 652 | |
House | 03/05/2009 | Filed |