E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective immediately
|
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6979
|
E
|
05/26/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 5164
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 2897
|
House
|
05/24/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 4640
|
House
|
05/23/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 4641
|
House
|
05/20/2009
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4217
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2579
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2579
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 2579
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2579
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2579
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 2579
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Rules suspended-Regular order of business
|
|
Journal Page: 2579
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2511
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2009
|
Reported from s/c favorably w/o amendments
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2009
|
Testimony taken in subcommittee
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2009
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing in s/c on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Refer to s/c on Flooding & Evacuations by Pres
|
|
Journal Page: 1659
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1659
|
Senate
|
04/06/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 889
|
House
|
04/03/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1093
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1063
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#109
|
Journal Page: 1062
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1062
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1062
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1056
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1056
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1056
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 989
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2009
|
Referred to Defense & Veterans' Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 652
|
House
|
03/11/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 652
|
House
|
03/05/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|