Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2611 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            81R13790 PAM-F
 By: Patrick H.B. No. 2611


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to establishing an interim committee to study the
 provision of dental services to certain public school students.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. (a) The Interim Select Committee on Dental
 Services for Public School Students is established to study the
 advisability and feasibility of requiring dental examinations for
 public school students who are entering the first grade. The
 committee's study must include an analysis of:
 (1) the advantages and disadvantages of requiring a
 dental examination performed by a dentist for each student not
 earlier than the 180th day before or later than the 30th day after
 the date the student enters the first grade; and
 (2) the costs associated with requiring a dental
 examination as described by Subdivision (1) of this subsection.
 (b) The committee is composed of 10 members appointed as
 follows:
 (1) three members appointed by the lieutenant
 governor, two of whom must be senators and the other one of whom
 must be a nonelected individual who holds a license under Subtitle
 D, Title 3, Occupations Code;
 (2) three members appointed by the speaker of the
 house of representatives, two of whom must be members of the house
 and the other one of whom must be a nonelected individual who holds
 a license under Subtitle D, Title 3, Occupations Code;
 (3) three members appointed by the governor, one of
 whom must be a nonelected individual who holds a license under
 Subtitle D, Title 3, Occupations Code, and the other two of whom may
 not be employed by a governmental entity; and
 (4) one member, appointed by the executive director of
 the State Board of Dental Examiners, who may not be employed by a
 governmental entity.
 (c) Not later than December 1, 2009, the committee shall
 hold an organizational meeting. At that meeting, the committee
 shall elect a presiding officer from among its members. Committee
 meetings shall be held at the call of the presiding officer.
 (d) The committee has all other powers and duties provided
 to a special or select committee by the rules of the senate and
 house of representatives, by Subchapter B, Chapter 301, Government
 Code, and by policies of the senate and house committees on
 administration.
 (e) From the contingent expense fund of the senate and the
 contingent expense fund of the house of representatives equally,
 the members of the committee are entitled to reimbursement for
 expenses incurred in carrying out this Act in accordance with the
 rules of the senate and house of representatives and the policies of
 the senate and house committees on administration.
 (f) Not later than February 1, 2011, the committee shall
 report the committee's findings and recommendations resulting from
 the study to the governor, lieutenant governor, the speaker of the
 house of representatives, and the members of the legislature.
 SECTION 2. Not later than November 1, 2009, the lieutenant
 governor, the speaker of the house of representatives, and the
 governor shall appoint members to the Interim Select Committee on
 Dental Services for Public School Students established under
 Section 1 of this Act.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.