E
|
06/19/2009
|
Effective on . . . . . . . . . . . . . . .
|
April 1, 2011
|
|
E
|
06/19/2009
|
Signed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6979
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6977
|
Senate
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5153
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6896
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6975
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4422
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Text of Senate Amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5381
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1431
|
Journal Page: 5381
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House concurs in Senate amendment(s)
|
|
Journal Page: 5381
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5118
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3174
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3174
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3174
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3174
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3179
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed to 3rd reading as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3174
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3179
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Amendment(s) offered
|
CA1 Duncan
|
Journal Page: 3174
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3174
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3174
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Ordered not printed
|
|
Journal Page: 2715
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Printing rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2715
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2009
|
Reported favorably as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2725
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Referred to Administration
|
|
Journal Page: 2223
|
Senate
|
05/11/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2223
|
Senate
|
04/27/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1631
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 1930
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1834
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#292
|
Journal Page: 1833
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1833
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1833
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Constitutional three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 1828
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Rules suspended
|
Rule 2, Section 1(a)(9)
|
Journal Page: 1802
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 1802
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Swinford
|
Journal Page: 1801
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1801
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1601
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Reported favorably as amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/23/2009
|
Printing rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 818
|
House
|
03/12/2009
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 664
|
House
|
03/12/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 664
|
House
|
03/05/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|