Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Removed from local & uncontested calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 3185
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2617
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Referred to Health & Human Services
|
|
Journal Page: 2093
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2093
|
Senate
|
05/01/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1880
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2337
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#412
|
Journal Page: 2170
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2170
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2170
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 2152
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2152
|
House
|
04/30/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1871
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/30/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Referred to County Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 697
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 697
|
House
|
03/06/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|