Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/15/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2442
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Referred to Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 1995
|
Senate
|
05/04/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 1995
|
Senate
|
04/29/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1720
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2217
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#335
|
Journal Page: 1950
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1950
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1950
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1939
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1939
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1601
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendment(s)
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/08/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
|
|
Journal Page: 698
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 698
|
House
|
03/06/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|