Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2724 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Woolley (Senate Sponsor - Patrick) H.B. No. 2724
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2009;
 May 4, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Jurisprudence; May 15, 2009, reported adversely, with favorable
 Committee Substitute by the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0;
 May 15, 2009, sent to printer.)
 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR H.B. No. 2724 By: Harris


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to persons authorized to conduct a marriage ceremony.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 2.202(a), Family Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 (a) The following persons are authorized to conduct a
 marriage ceremony:
 (1) a licensed or ordained Christian minister or
 priest;
 (2) a Jewish rabbi;
 (3) a person who is an officer of a religious
 organization and who is authorized by the organization to conduct a
 marriage ceremony; and
 (4) a justice of the supreme court, judge of the court
 of criminal appeals, justice of the courts of appeals, judge of the
 district, county, and probate courts, judge of the county courts at
 law, judge of the courts of domestic relations, judge of the
 juvenile courts, retired justice or judge of those courts, justice
 of the peace, retired justice of the peace, [or] judge or magistrate
 of a federal court of this state, or current and former members of
 the legislature of this state.
 SECTION 2. The change in law made by this Act applies only
 to a marriage ceremony that is conducted on or after the effective
 date of this Act. A marriage ceremony conducted before the
 effective date of this Act is governed by the law in effect on the
 date the ceremony was conducted, and the former law is continued in
 effect for that purpose.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *