1 | 1 | | 81R18673 EAH-F |
---|
2 | 2 | | By: Paxton, et al. H.B. No. 2743 |
---|
3 | 3 | | Substitute the following for H.B. No. 2743: |
---|
4 | 4 | | By: Marquez C.S.H.B. No. 2743 |
---|
5 | 5 | | |
---|
6 | 6 | | |
---|
7 | 7 | | A BILL TO BE ENTITLED |
---|
8 | 8 | | AN ACT |
---|
9 | 9 | | relating to the availability of certain county financial |
---|
10 | 10 | | information on certain counties' Internet websites. |
---|
11 | 11 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
12 | 12 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 112, Local Government |
---|
13 | 13 | | Code, is amended by adding Section 112.011 to read as follows: |
---|
14 | 14 | | Sec. 112.011. ELECTRONIC CHECKING ACCOUNT TRANSACTION |
---|
15 | 15 | | REGISTER. (a) This section applies only to a county with a |
---|
16 | 16 | | population of 250,000 or more. |
---|
17 | 17 | | (b) The county treasurer shall maintain the transaction |
---|
18 | 18 | | register for the county's checking account in a searchable |
---|
19 | 19 | | electronic spreadsheet format, such as a portable document format |
---|
20 | 20 | | (PDF) or similar file type, in which the transaction register is |
---|
21 | 21 | | readily available for purposes of Subsection (d). Except as |
---|
22 | 22 | | provided by Subsection (c), the electronic checking account |
---|
23 | 23 | | transaction register must include for each check written from a |
---|
24 | 24 | | county checking account: |
---|
25 | 25 | | (1) the transaction amount; |
---|
26 | 26 | | (2) the name of the payee; and |
---|
27 | 27 | | (3) a statement of the purpose of the expenditure for |
---|
28 | 28 | | which the check was written. |
---|
29 | 29 | | (b-1) Notwithstanding Subsection (b), beginning September |
---|
30 | 30 | | 1, 2010, a county's electronic checking account transaction |
---|
31 | 31 | | register must contain the information required by Subsections |
---|
32 | 32 | | (b)(1) and (2) for each check dated on or after August 1, 2010. |
---|
33 | 33 | | Beginning September 1, 2011, a county's electronic checking account |
---|
34 | 34 | | transaction register must contain the information required by |
---|
35 | 35 | | Subsections (b)(1) through (3) for each check dated on or after |
---|
36 | 36 | | August 1, 2011. This subsection expires October 1, 2011. |
---|
37 | 37 | | (c) A county may not include in the county's electronic |
---|
38 | 38 | | checking account transaction register a check issued to a county |
---|
39 | 39 | | employee in payment of: |
---|
40 | 40 | | (1) salary, wages, or an employment stipend; or |
---|
41 | 41 | | (2) a workers' compensation income benefit, medical |
---|
42 | 42 | | benefit, death benefit, or burial benefit that is issued by a county |
---|
43 | 43 | | operating as a self-insurer under Chapter 504, Labor Code. |
---|
44 | 44 | | (d) A county shall post the electronic checking account |
---|
45 | 45 | | transaction register at all times on the county's Internet website |
---|
46 | 46 | | for viewing and downloading by interested persons. The county may |
---|
47 | 47 | | not charge a fee to a person who views or downloads the electronic |
---|
48 | 48 | | checking account transaction register under this subsection. |
---|
49 | 49 | | (e) A county shall: |
---|
50 | 50 | | (1) update the electronic checking account |
---|
51 | 51 | | transaction register at least once each month, not later than the |
---|
52 | 52 | | 30th day after the closing date of the most recent monthly statement |
---|
53 | 53 | | for the checking account; and |
---|
54 | 54 | | (2) maintain each transaction or listing in the |
---|
55 | 55 | | electronic checking account transaction register on the county's |
---|
56 | 56 | | Internet website until the first anniversary of the date of the |
---|
57 | 57 | | transaction or listing. |
---|
58 | 58 | | (f) The county treasurer may consult with the comptroller in |
---|
59 | 59 | | developing an electronic checking account transaction register |
---|
60 | 60 | | under this section. |
---|
61 | 61 | | (g) This section does not apply to a county that maintains a |
---|
62 | 62 | | check registry or a similar comprehensive monthly financial report |
---|
63 | 63 | | that was posted on the county's Internet website for public viewing |
---|
64 | 64 | | and downloading on or before August 1, 2010. |
---|
65 | 65 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
66 | 66 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
67 | 67 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
68 | 68 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
69 | 69 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|