Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2743 Latest Draft

Bill / House Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            81R18673 EAH-F
 By: Paxton, et al. H.B. No. 2743
 Substitute the following for H.B. No. 2743:
 By: Marquez C.S.H.B. No. 2743


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the availability of certain county financial
 information on certain counties' Internet websites.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter A, Chapter 112, Local Government
 Code, is amended by adding Section 112.011 to read as follows:
 Sec. 112.011.  ELECTRONIC CHECKING ACCOUNT TRANSACTION
 REGISTER. (a)  This section applies only to a county with a
 population of 250,000 or more.
 (b)  The county treasurer shall maintain the transaction
 register for the county's checking account in a searchable
 electronic spreadsheet format, such as a portable document format
 (PDF) or similar file type, in which the transaction register is
 readily available for purposes of Subsection (d). Except as
 provided by Subsection (c), the electronic checking account
 transaction register must include for each check written from a
 county checking account:
 (1) the transaction amount;
 (2) the name of the payee; and
 (3)  a statement of the purpose of the expenditure for
 which the check was written.
 (b-1)  Notwithstanding Subsection (b), beginning September
 1, 2010, a county's electronic checking account transaction
 register must contain the information required by Subsections
 (b)(1) and (2) for each check dated on or after August 1, 2010.
 Beginning September 1, 2011, a county's electronic checking account
 transaction register must contain the information required by
 Subsections (b)(1) through (3) for each check dated on or after
 August 1, 2011.  This subsection expires October 1, 2011.
 (c)  A county may not include in the county's electronic
 checking account transaction register a check issued to a county
 employee in payment of:
 (1) salary, wages, or an employment stipend; or
 (2)  a workers' compensation income benefit, medical
 benefit, death benefit, or burial benefit that is issued by a county
 operating as a self-insurer under Chapter 504, Labor Code.
 (d)  A county shall post the electronic checking account
 transaction register at all times on the county's Internet website
 for viewing and downloading by interested persons.  The county may
 not charge a fee to a person who views or downloads the electronic
 checking account transaction register under this subsection.
 (e) A county shall:
 (1)  update the electronic checking account
 transaction register at least once each month, not later than the
 30th day after the closing date of the most recent monthly statement
 for the checking account; and
 (2)  maintain each transaction or listing in the
 electronic checking account transaction register on the county's
 Internet website until the first anniversary of the date of the
 transaction or listing.
 (f)  The county treasurer may consult with the comptroller in
 developing an electronic checking account transaction register
 under this section.
 (g)  This section does not apply to a county that maintains a
 check registry or a similar comprehensive monthly financial report
 that was posted on the county's Internet website for public viewing
 and downloading on or before August 1, 2010.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.