House
|
05/14/2009
|
Laid on the table subject to call
|
|
Journal Page: 3657
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Companion considered in lieu of
|
CSSB 546
|
Journal Page: 3655
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Postponed
|
5/14/09 8:45 PM
|
Journal Page: 3643
|
House
|
05/14/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3643
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Postponed
|
5/14/09 9:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 3432
|
House
|
05/13/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3432
|
House
|
05/08/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/02/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2336
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Recalled from subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Left pending in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in s/c
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Considered by s/c in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Subcommittee members named
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2009
|
Referred directly to subcommittee by chair
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2009
|
Referred to Energy Resources
|
|
Journal Page: 314
|
House
|
02/18/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 314
|
House
|
11/18/2008
|
Filed
|
|
|