E
|
06/19/2009
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6980
|
E
|
05/29/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6040
|
Senate
|
05/28/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 4137
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 5197
|
House
|
05/28/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 5986
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Senate passage reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5119
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3179
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3179
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3179
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3179
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3179
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3179
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3179
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2617
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Referred to Administration
|
|
Journal Page: 2352
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2352
|
Senate
|
05/12/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2239
|
House
|
05/12/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3441
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#729
|
Journal Page: 3080
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Passed as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 3080
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Amended
|
1-W. Smith
|
Journal Page: 3078
|
House
|
05/11/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 3078
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Postponed
|
5/11/09 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 2565
|
House
|
05/06/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2564
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2480
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Laubenberg
|
Journal Page: 2480
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2479
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Postponed
|
5/5/09 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 2224
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Laid out as postponed business
|
|
Journal Page: 2224
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Postponed
|
5/1/09 10:00 AM
|
Journal Page: 2120
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2119
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Placed on General State Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2009
|
Considered in Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Committee report sent to Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1601
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Vote reconsidered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/14/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Reported favorably as amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/07/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Left pending in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Amendment(s) considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
03/31/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Referred to State Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 705
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 705
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|