Texas 2009 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2820 Senate Committee Report / Bill

Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                    By: Chisum, Chavez (Senate Sponsor - Wentworth) H.B. No. 2820
 (In the Senate - Received from the House May 12, 2009;
 May 13, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Administration; May 20, 2009, reported favorably by the following
 vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 20, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to contracts by governmental entities for professional
 services relating to geoscience and landscape architecture.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 2254.002(2), Government Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (2) "Professional services" means services:
 (A) within the scope of the practice, as defined
 by state law, of:
 (i) accounting;
 (ii) architecture;
 (iii) landscape architecture;
 (iv) land surveying;
 (v) medicine;
 (vi) optometry;
 (vii) professional engineering;
 (viii) real estate appraising; [or]
 (ix) professional nursing; or
 (x) professional geoscience; or
 (B) provided in connection with the professional
 employment or practice of a person who is licensed or registered as:
 (i) a certified public accountant;
 (ii) an architect;
 (iii) a landscape architect;
 (iv) a land surveyor;
 (v) a physician, including a surgeon;
 (vi) an optometrist;
 (vii) a professional engineer;
 (viii) a state certified or state licensed
 real estate appraiser; [or]
 (ix) a registered nurse; or
 (x) a professional geoscientist.
 SECTION 2. The heading to Section 2254.004, Government
 Code, is amended to read as follows:
 Sec. 2254.004. CONTRACT FOR PROFESSIONAL SERVICES OF
 ARCHITECT, ENGINEER, [OR] SURVEYOR, LANDSCAPE ARCHITECT, OR
 GEOSCIENTIST.
 SECTION 3. Sections 2254.004(a) and (b), Government Code,
 are amended to read as follows:
 (a) In procuring architectural, engineering, [or] land
 surveying, landscape architectural, or geoscientific services, a
 governmental entity shall:
 (1) first select the most highly qualified provider of
 those services on the basis of demonstrated competence and
 qualifications; and
 (2) then attempt to negotiate with that provider a
 contract at a fair and reasonable price.
 (b) If a satisfactory contract cannot be negotiated with the
 most highly qualified provider of architectural, engineering, [or]
 land surveying, landscape architectural, or geoscientific
 services, the entity shall:
 (1) formally end negotiations with that provider;
 (2) select the next most highly qualified provider;
 and
 (3) attempt to negotiate a contract with that provider
 at a fair and reasonable price.
 SECTION 4. The changes in law made by this Act apply only to
 the selection of a provider of professional geoscientific services
 or the award of a contract to provide professional geoscientific
 services made on or after October 1, 2009.
 SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *