Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2009
|
Not again placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2009
|
Placed on intent calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/18/2009
|
Reported favorably w/o amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 2511
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/13/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 2093
|
Senate
|
05/06/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2093
|
Senate
|
04/29/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 1720
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 2217
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 1950
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#335
|
Journal Page: 1950
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 1950
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1950
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Passed to engrossment
|
|
Journal Page: 1939
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 1939
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/20/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 1662
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Referred to Urban Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 706
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 706
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|