Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2827 Latest Draft

Bill / Senate Committee Report Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            By: Turner of Harris (Senate Sponsor - Ellis) H.B. No. 2827
 (In the Senate - Received from the House April 29, 2009;
 May 6, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on
 Intergovernmental Relations; May 18, 2009, reported favorably by
 the following vote: Yeas 5, Nays 0; May 18, 2009, sent to printer.)


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of the emergency housing and disaster
 recovery division within the Texas Department of Housing and
 Community Affairs.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 2306.0521, Government Code, is amended
 by adding Subsection (c) to read as follows:
 (c)  Notwithstanding Subsection (a), the department shall
 establish and maintain an emergency housing and disaster recovery
 division. The division shall:
 (1)  develop a program to provide for the rapid
 deployment of temporary housing for homeowners affected by natural
 disasters;
 (2)  develop a program to quickly restore or replace
 permanent housing for homeowners affected by natural disasters;
 (3)  develop a program to quickly provide additional
 rental housing to areas affected by natural disasters;
 (4)  provide funding to nonprofit agencies that provide
 to homeowners affected by natural disasters counseling on
 refinancing options and financial assistance available through
 state and federal programs; and
 (5)  collaborate with the division of emergency
 management established under Chapter 418 and the Federal Emergency
 Management Agency to secure reimbursement for housing needs in
 areas affected by natural disasters.
 SECTION 2. Section 2306.056, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subsections (c) and (d) to read as follows:
 (c)  If federal or state money, other than money appropriated
 to the department under a current services budget for the state
 fiscal biennium prepared for the state budgetary process is
 allocated to the department to address the results of a natural
 disaster, the board may appoint a committee composed of residents
 of the affected area. The committee shall serve until 90 percent of
 the money allocated to the department to address the results of the
 natural disaster has been spent. The committee shall advise the
 department and the emergency housing and disaster recovery division
 with regards to resource allocation.
 (d)  The department shall develop and implement policies
 that provide the public with a reasonable opportunity to appear
 periodically before a committee created under Subsection (c) and to
 speak on any issue under the jurisdiction of the emergency housing
 and disaster recovery division.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 * * * * *