1 | 1 | | H.B. No. 2854 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to license plates created by the Texas Department of |
---|
6 | 6 | | Transportation for professional firefighters. |
---|
7 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 8 | | SECTION 1. Subchapter E, Chapter 504, Transportation Code, |
---|
9 | 9 | | is amended by adding Section 504.414 to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 10 | | Sec. 504.414. PROFESSIONAL FIREFIGHTER PLATES. (a) The |
---|
11 | 11 | | professional firefighter plate may be issued to qualified |
---|
12 | 12 | | firefighters. The sponsor of the plate may nominate a state agency |
---|
13 | 13 | | for receipt of funds under Section 504.801(e)(2)(A). |
---|
14 | 14 | | (b) After deduction of the department's administrative |
---|
15 | 15 | | costs in accordance with Section 504.801, the remainder of the fees |
---|
16 | 16 | | from the sale of professional firefighter plates shall be deposited |
---|
17 | 17 | | to the credit of an account in the state treasury to be used by the |
---|
18 | 18 | | nominated state agency for the purpose of making grants to support |
---|
19 | 19 | | the activities of an organization of professional firefighters |
---|
20 | 20 | | located in this state that provides emergency relief and college |
---|
21 | 21 | | scholarship funds to the professional firefighters and their |
---|
22 | 22 | | dependents. |
---|
23 | 23 | | SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives |
---|
24 | 24 | | a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as |
---|
25 | 25 | | provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this |
---|
26 | 26 | | Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this |
---|
27 | 27 | | Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
28 | 28 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
29 | 29 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
30 | 30 | | I certify that H.B. No. 2854 was passed by the House on May 5, |
---|
31 | 31 | | 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, 1 present, not |
---|
32 | 32 | | voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to |
---|
33 | 33 | | H.B. No. 2854 on May 29, 2009, and requested the appointment of a |
---|
34 | 34 | | conference committee to consider the differences between the two |
---|
35 | 35 | | houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report |
---|
36 | 36 | | on H.B. No. 2854 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 142, |
---|
37 | 37 | | Nays 0, 1 present, not voting. |
---|
38 | 38 | | ______________________________ |
---|
39 | 39 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
40 | 40 | | I certify that H.B. No. 2854 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
41 | 41 | | amendments, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
42 | 42 | | 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference |
---|
43 | 43 | | committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and |
---|
44 | 44 | | that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. |
---|
45 | 45 | | 2854 on June 1, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
46 | 46 | | ______________________________ |
---|
47 | 47 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
48 | 48 | | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
49 | 49 | | Date |
---|
50 | 50 | | __________________ |
---|
51 | 51 | | Governor |
---|