Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2854 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 2854


 AN ACT
 relating to license plates created by the Texas Department of
 Transportation for professional firefighters.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter E, Chapter 504, Transportation Code,
 is amended by adding Section 504.414 to read as follows:
 Sec. 504.414.  PROFESSIONAL FIREFIGHTER PLATES.  (a)  The
 professional firefighter plate may be issued to qualified
 firefighters.  The sponsor of the plate may nominate a state agency
 for receipt of funds under Section 504.801(e)(2)(A).
 (b)  After deduction of the department's administrative
 costs in accordance with Section 504.801, the remainder of the fees
 from the sale of professional firefighter plates shall be deposited
 to the credit of an account in the state treasury to be used by the
 nominated state agency for the purpose of making grants to support
 the activities of an organization of professional firefighters
 located in this state that provides emergency relief and college
 scholarship funds to the professional firefighters and their
 dependents.
 SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2854 was passed by the House on May 5,
 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 144, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to
 H.B. No. 2854 on May 29, 2009, and requested the appointment of a
 conference committee to consider the differences between the two
 houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report
 on H.B. No. 2854 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 142,
 Nays 0, 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2854 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference
 committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and
 that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No.
 2854 on June 1, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor