E
|
06/19/2009
|
Vetoed by the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6980
|
E
|
06/03/2009
|
Sent to the Governor
|
|
Journal Page: 6977
|
Senate
|
06/03/2009
|
Signed in the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 5152
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Signed in the House
|
|
Journal Page: 6967
|
House
|
06/01/2009
|
Reported enrolled
|
|
Journal Page: 6975
|
Senate
|
06/01/2009
|
House adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5043
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 6754
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#1708
|
Journal Page: 6753
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
House adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 6751
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conf. comm. report-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 6902
|
Senate
|
05/31/2009
|
Senate adopts conference committee report
|
|
Journal Page: 5019
|
House
|
05/31/2009
|
Conf. Comm. Report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2009
|
Conference committee report filed
|
|
Journal Page: 4957
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5986
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate grants request for conf comm-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5986
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 4493
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
Senate grants request for conference comm.
|
|
Journal Page: 4493
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House appoints conferees-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4424
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House requests conference committee-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4424
|
Senate
|
05/29/2009
|
House refuses to concur-reported
|
|
Journal Page: 4424
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House appoints conferees
|
|
Journal Page: 5291
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House requests conference committee
|
|
Journal Page: 5291
|
House
|
05/29/2009
|
House refuses to concur in Senate amendments
|
|
Journal Page: 5291
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Senate Amendments printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Senate Amendments Analysis distributed
|
|
|
House
|
05/27/2009
|
Senate passage as amended reported
|
|
Journal Page: 5130
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 3511
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 3511
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Record vote
|
|
Journal Page: 3511
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Three day rule suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 3511
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 3511
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Read 2nd time & passed to 3rd reading
|
|
Journal Page: 3511
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Laid before the Senate
|
|
Journal Page: 3511
|
Senate
|
05/27/2009
|
Placed on local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Recommended for local & uncontested calendar
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
Journal Page: 2759
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Testimony taken in committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Referred to Intergovernmental Relations
|
|
Journal Page: 2180
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 2180
|
Senate
|
05/08/2009
|
Received from the House
|
|
Journal Page: 2144
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Reported engrossed
|
|
Journal Page: 3042
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Nonrecord vote recorded in Journal
|
|
Journal Page: 2692
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Record vote
|
RV#620
|
Journal Page: 2692
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Passed
|
|
Journal Page: 2692
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2692
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Passed to engrossment as amended
|
|
Journal Page: 2685
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Amended
|
1-Martinez
|
Journal Page: 2685
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
Journal Page: 2685
|
House
|
05/07/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Rules suspended
|
|
Journal Page: 2514
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Returned to Local & Consent Calendars Comm.
|
|
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Withdrawn from calendar
|
|
Journal Page: 2443
|
House
|
05/05/2009
|
Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2009
|
Considered in Local & Consent Calendars
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2009
|
Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Committee report printed and distributed
|
|
|
House
|
04/28/2009
|
Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator
|
|
Journal Page: 2135
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Reported favorably as substituted
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Committee substitute considered in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Considered in public hearing
|
|
|
House
|
04/21/2009
|
Scheduled for public hearing on . . .
|
|
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Referred to Urban Affairs
|
|
Journal Page: 711
|
House
|
03/17/2009
|
Read first time
|
|
Journal Page: 711
|
House
|
03/09/2009
|
Filed
|
|
|