1 | 1 | | H.B. No. 2888 |
---|
2 | 2 | | |
---|
3 | 3 | | |
---|
4 | 4 | | AN ACT |
---|
5 | 5 | | relating to financial assistance administered by the Texas |
---|
6 | 6 | | Department of Housing and Community Affairs. |
---|
7 | 7 | | BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: |
---|
8 | 8 | | SECTION 1. Chapter 2306, Government Code, is amended by |
---|
9 | 9 | | adding Subchapter NN to read as follows: |
---|
10 | 10 | | SUBCHAPTER NN. VOLUNTEER INCOME TAX ASSISTANCE (VITA) GRANT |
---|
11 | 11 | | PROGRAM |
---|
12 | 12 | | Sec. 2306.1091. DEFINITION. In this subchapter, "volunteer |
---|
13 | 13 | | income tax assistance program" means a program operated through a |
---|
14 | 14 | | collaboration of the Internal Revenue Service and another entity |
---|
15 | 15 | | under which taxpayers eligible for the Free File program receive |
---|
16 | 16 | | free assistance in preparing federal income tax returns. |
---|
17 | 17 | | Sec. 2306.1092. ESTABLISHMENT OF VOLUNTEER INCOME TAX |
---|
18 | 18 | | ASSISTANCE (VITA) GRANT PROGRAM. The department shall establish a |
---|
19 | 19 | | volunteer income tax assistance grant program through which the |
---|
20 | 20 | | department will award grants each year to support the |
---|
21 | 21 | | implementation and operation of volunteer income tax assistance |
---|
22 | 22 | | programs. |
---|
23 | 23 | | Sec. 2306.1093. ADMINISTRATION OF GRANT PROGRAM. In the |
---|
24 | 24 | | year preceding the federal income tax filing season in which grant |
---|
25 | 25 | | recipients will operate volunteer income tax assistance programs, |
---|
26 | 26 | | the department shall issue a request for proposals to participate |
---|
27 | 27 | | in the grant program, select and notify grant recipients, and, on or |
---|
28 | 28 | | before November 1, distribute grant program money. |
---|
29 | 29 | | Sec. 2306.1094. ELIGIBILITY. To be eligible for a grant, an |
---|
30 | 30 | | applicant must be located in this state and be: |
---|
31 | 31 | | (1) a nonprofit educational institution, a nonprofit |
---|
32 | 32 | | faith-based or community-based organization, or any other |
---|
33 | 33 | | nonprofit organization; |
---|
34 | 34 | | (2) a political subdivision of this state, including a |
---|
35 | 35 | | county or municipality; or |
---|
36 | 36 | | (3) a regional or local coalition that has at least one |
---|
37 | 37 | | lead organization that meets the criteria specified by Subdivision |
---|
38 | 38 | | (1) or (2). |
---|
39 | 39 | | Sec. 2306.1095. PERFORMANCE AGREEMENT AND REPORT. Each |
---|
40 | 40 | | grant recipient shall enter into an agreement with the department |
---|
41 | 41 | | with respect to the use of the grant program money and submit a |
---|
42 | 42 | | performance report to the department. |
---|
43 | 43 | | Sec. 2306.1096. GRANT PROGRAM FUNDING. (a) To the extent |
---|
44 | 44 | | authorized by federal law and subject to the availability of money |
---|
45 | 45 | | for this purpose, the department may distribute as grants |
---|
46 | 46 | | authorized by this subchapter not more than 0.25 percent of the |
---|
47 | 47 | | money received by this state during each state fiscal biennium |
---|
48 | 48 | | under the federal Temporary Assistance for Needy Families block |
---|
49 | 49 | | grant. |
---|
50 | 50 | | (b) The comptroller may transfer money received under the |
---|
51 | 51 | | federal Temporary Assistance for Needy Families block grant from |
---|
52 | 52 | | the Health and Human Services Commission and the Texas Workforce |
---|
53 | 53 | | Commission to the department as necessary to implement this |
---|
54 | 54 | | section. |
---|
55 | 55 | | (c) In addition to money described by Subsection (a), the |
---|
56 | 56 | | department may distribute as grants authorized by this subchapter |
---|
57 | 57 | | money received under the community services block grant program and |
---|
58 | 58 | | other money that is appropriated for that purpose or designated by |
---|
59 | 59 | | the department and otherwise available for that purpose. |
---|
60 | 60 | | Sec. 2306.1097. RULES. The board shall adopt rules as |
---|
61 | 61 | | necessary to implement this subchapter, including rules providing |
---|
62 | 62 | | for a grant application process and for appropriate restrictions on |
---|
63 | 63 | | how the grant program money may be used. |
---|
64 | 64 | | SECTION 2. Section 2306.111, Government Code, is amended by |
---|
65 | 65 | | adding Subsection (k) to read as follows: |
---|
66 | 66 | | (k) The department by rule shall: |
---|
67 | 67 | | (1) adopt policies to ensure that each housing |
---|
68 | 68 | | development that receives financial assistance administered by the |
---|
69 | 69 | | department, including financial assistance from the proceeds of |
---|
70 | 70 | | bonds issued by the department: |
---|
71 | 71 | | (A) reserves a certain number of units in the |
---|
72 | 72 | | development for individuals and families of very low income, to the |
---|
73 | 73 | | extent that the reservation does not conflict with any requirements |
---|
74 | 74 | | for the development under 26 U.S.C. Section 42; and |
---|
75 | 75 | | (B) except as otherwise permitted by law, accepts |
---|
76 | 76 | | as tenants individuals and families receiving rental assistance |
---|
77 | 77 | | under Section 8, United States Housing Act of 1937 (42 U.S.C. |
---|
78 | 78 | | Section 1437f), or some other form of rental assistance from a |
---|
79 | 79 | | political subdivision of this state or from the state or federal |
---|
80 | 80 | | government; and |
---|
81 | 81 | | (2) establish enforcement mechanisms with respect to |
---|
82 | 82 | | those housing developments that refuse to admit individuals and |
---|
83 | 83 | | families as described by Subdivision (1)(B). |
---|
84 | 84 | | SECTION 3. If before implementing any provision of this Act |
---|
85 | 85 | | a state agency determines that a waiver or authorization from a |
---|
86 | 86 | | federal agency is necessary for implementation of that provision, |
---|
87 | 87 | | the agency affected by the provision shall request the waiver or |
---|
88 | 88 | | authorization and may delay implementing that provision until the |
---|
89 | 89 | | waiver or authorization is granted. |
---|
90 | 90 | | SECTION 4. (a) The change in law made by this Act in adding |
---|
91 | 91 | | Section 2306.111(k), Government Code, applies only to an |
---|
92 | 92 | | application for financial assistance that is submitted by a housing |
---|
93 | 93 | | development to the Texas Department of Housing and Community |
---|
94 | 94 | | Affairs on or after January 1, 2010. An application for financial |
---|
95 | 95 | | assistance that is submitted by a housing development to the |
---|
96 | 96 | | department before January 1, 2010, is governed by the law in effect |
---|
97 | 97 | | when the application was submitted, and the former law is continued |
---|
98 | 98 | | in effect for that purpose. |
---|
99 | 99 | | (b) Not later than December 1, 2009, the Texas Department of |
---|
100 | 100 | | Housing and Community Affairs shall adopt the rules required by |
---|
101 | 101 | | Section 2306.111(k), Government Code, as added by this Act. |
---|
102 | 102 | | SECTION 5. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009. |
---|
103 | 103 | | ______________________________ ______________________________ |
---|
104 | 104 | | President of the Senate Speaker of the House |
---|
105 | 105 | | I certify that H.B. No. 2888 was passed by the House on May 7, |
---|
106 | 106 | | 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 143, Nays 3, 1 present, not |
---|
107 | 107 | | voting; that the House refused to concur in Senate amendments to |
---|
108 | 108 | | H.B. No. 2888 on May 29, 2009, and requested the appointment of a |
---|
109 | 109 | | conference committee to consider the differences between the two |
---|
110 | 110 | | houses; and that the House adopted the conference committee report |
---|
111 | 111 | | on H.B. No. 2888 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 83, |
---|
112 | 112 | | Nays 60, 1 present, not voting. |
---|
113 | 113 | | ______________________________ |
---|
114 | 114 | | Chief Clerk of the House |
---|
115 | 115 | | I certify that H.B. No. 2888 was passed by the Senate, with |
---|
116 | 116 | | amendments, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays |
---|
117 | 117 | | 0; at the request of the House, the Senate appointed a conference |
---|
118 | 118 | | committee to consider the differences between the two houses; and |
---|
119 | 119 | | that the Senate adopted the conference committee report on H.B. No. |
---|
120 | 120 | | 2888 on May 31, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays 0. |
---|
121 | 121 | | ______________________________ |
---|
122 | 122 | | Secretary of the Senate |
---|
123 | 123 | | APPROVED: __________________ |
---|
124 | 124 | | Date |
---|
125 | 125 | | __________________ |
---|
126 | 126 | | Governor |
---|