By: McReynolds, Gonzalez Toureilles, Guillen H.B. No. 2914 (Senate Sponsor - Nichols) (In the Senate - Received from the House April 16, 2009; April 27, 2009, read first time and referred to Committee on Agriculture and Rural Affairs; May 19, 2009, reported favorably by the following vote: Yeas 3, Nays 0; May 19, 2009, sent to printer.) A BILL TO BE ENTITLED AN ACT relating to the establishment of a fuel mitigation pilot grant program for fire departments. BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS: SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 88, Education Code, is amended by adding Section 88.121 to read as follows: Sec. 88.121. FUEL MITIGATION PILOT GRANT PROGRAM. (a) The Texas Forest Service, with the advice of the advisory committee appointed under Section 614.073, Government Code, may: (1) establish and administer a pilot program under this section to provide grants to fire departments to assist with the costs of fuel mitigation; and (2) adopt rules consistent with this section as necessary to implement this section, including rules establishing: (A) reasonable criteria and qualifications for the distribution of grant money under the pilot program; and (B) a procedure for reporting and processing requests for grant money under the pilot program. (b) The Texas Forest Service may solicit and accept gifts, grants, and donations from any public or private source for purposes of this section. (c) If the Texas Forest Service establishes a pilot program under this section, the director shall, not later than December 1, 2010, submit a written report to the legislature on the effectiveness of the pilot program in mitigating fuel hazards. (d) Notwithstanding Section 614.075(b), Government Code, money in the rural volunteer fire department insurance fund may also be used for purposes of the pilot program under this section. (e) This section expires September 1, 2011. SECTION 2. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this Act takes effect September 1, 2009. * * * * *