Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2914 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 2914


 AN ACT
 relating to the establishment of a fuel mitigation pilot grant
 program for fire departments.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Subchapter B, Chapter 88, Education Code, is
 amended by adding Section 88.121 to read as follows:
 Sec. 88.121.  FUEL MITIGATION PILOT GRANT PROGRAM. (a)  The
 Texas Forest Service, with the advice of the advisory committee
 appointed under Section 614.073, Government Code, may:
 (1)  establish and administer a pilot program under
 this section to provide grants to fire departments to assist with
 the costs of fuel mitigation; and
 (2)  adopt rules consistent with this section as
 necessary to implement this section, including rules establishing:
 (A)  reasonable criteria and qualifications for
 the distribution of grant money under the pilot program; and
 (B)  a procedure for reporting and processing
 requests for grant money under the pilot program.
 (b)  The Texas Forest Service may solicit and accept gifts,
 grants, and donations from any public or private source for
 purposes of this section.
 (c)  If the Texas Forest Service establishes a pilot program
 under this section, the director shall, not later than December 1,
 2010, submit a written report to the legislature on the
 effectiveness of the pilot program in mitigating fuel hazards.
 (d)  Notwithstanding Section 614.075(b), Government Code,
 money in the rural volunteer fire department insurance fund may
 also be used for purposes of the pilot program under this section.
 (e) This section expires September 1, 2011.
 SECTION 2. This Act does not make an appropriation. A
 provision in this Act that creates a new governmental program,
 creates a new entitlement, or imposes a new duty on a governmental
 entity is not mandatory during a fiscal period for which the
 legislature has not made a specific appropriation to implement the
 provision.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect immediately if it receives
 a vote of two-thirds of all the members elected to each house, as
 provided by Section 39, Article III, Texas Constitution. If this
 Act does not receive the vote necessary for immediate effect, this
 Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2914 was passed by the House on April
 15, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 146, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 2914 on May 29, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 142, Nays 0,
 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2914 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 25, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor