Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2932 Latest Draft

Bill / Enrolled Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            H.B. No. 2932


 AN ACT
 relating to including in the law enforcement information system
 information indicating that criminal defendants have committed
 certain additional offenses.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Chapter 411, Government Code, is amended by
 adding Subchapter D-1 to read as follows:
 SUBCHAPTER D-1.  CENTRAL INDEX OF CERTAIN ADDITIONAL OFFENSES
 SUSPECTED TO HAVE BEEN COMMITTED BY CRIMINAL DEFENDANTS
 Sec. 411.0601.  DEFINITION.  In this subchapter, "criminal
 justice agency" has the meaning assigned by Article 60.01, Code of
 Criminal Procedure.
 Sec. 411.0602.  ESTABLISHMENT OF CENTRAL INDEX; ENTRY OF
 INFORMATION.  (a)  In the law enforcement information system
 maintained by the department, the bureau of identification and
 records shall establish and maintain a central index to collect and
 disseminate information regarding additional offenses that
 forensic DNA test results indicate may have been committed by a
 defendant who has been arrested for or charged with any felony or
 misdemeanor offense, other than a misdemeanor offense punishable by
 fine only.
 (b)  Information relating to a defendant described by
 Subsection (a) may be entered in the central index only if the
 information is based on forensic DNA test results indicating that
 the DNA profile of the defendant cannot be excluded as a donor to
 the DNA profile of a person suspected to have committed an offense,
 regardless of whether the defendant has been or will be arrested for
 or charged with that offense.  The information must be:
 (1)  submitted in the form of an affidavit signed by a
 representative of an investigating criminal justice agency and
 approved by a district judge; and
 (2)  accompanied by a set of the defendant's
 fingerprints.
 Sec. 411.0603.  CONFIDENTIALITY AND DISSEMINATION OF
 INFORMATION IN CENTRAL INDEX.  (a)  Information maintained by the
 department in the central index established under this subchapter
 is confidential. The department may not disseminate the
 information except as otherwise provided by this section.
 (b)  On proper inquiry, the department shall disseminate to a
 criminal justice agency the information collected under Section
 411.0602. The criminal justice agency may disseminate the
 information to any other criminal justice agency if the
 dissemination of that information is for a criminal justice
 purpose.
 (c)  A criminal justice agency or an employee of a criminal
 justice agency is not liable for an act or omission relating to the
 collection, use, or dissemination of information collected under
 Section 411.0602 if that collection, use, or dissemination is
 performed in accordance with rules adopted by the director.
 Sec. 411.0604.  RULES.  The director shall adopt rules to
 implement and enforce this subchapter.
 Sec. 411.0605.  RIGHT TO REQUEST NOTICE OF ENTRY IN CENTRAL
 INDEX. (a) A defendant described by Section 411.0602(a) may submit
 to the bureau of identification and records a request to determine
 whether the bureau has entered information relating to the
 defendant in the central index established under Section 411.0602.
 The bureau shall respond to the request not later than the 10th
 business day after the date the bureau receives the request.
 (b)  Before responding to a request under Subsection (a), the
 bureau may require reasonable written verification of the identity
 of the defendant submitting the request, including written
 verification of an address, date of birth, driver's license number,
 state identification card number, or social security number.
 Sec. 411.0606.  RIGHT TO REQUEST REVIEW OF ENTRY IN CENTRAL
 INDEX.  (a)  On receipt by the bureau of identification and records
 of a written request that is submitted by a defendant described by
 Section 411.0602(a), that is accompanied by a set of the
 defendant's fingerprints, and that alleges that the bureau may have
 entered inaccurate information relating to the defendant in the
 central index established under Section 411.0602, the head of the
 bureau or that person's designee and the head of the department's
 crime laboratory in Austin each shall review the information to
 determine whether there is a high likelihood that the information
 is accurate.
 (b)  If after review the head of the bureau or that person's
 designee or the head of the department's crime laboratory in Austin
 determines there is not a high likelihood that the information
 relating to the defendant is accurate, the bureau shall:
 (1)  promptly remove that information from the central
 index; and
 (2)  notify other appropriate divisions of the
 department, the investigating criminal justice agency, and the
 defendant of the bureau's determination and the removal of the
 information.
 (c)  If after review the head of the bureau or that person's
 designee and the head of the department's crime laboratory in
 Austin jointly determine there is a high likelihood that the
 information relating to the defendant is accurate, the bureau shall
 notify the defendant of that determination.
 SECTION 2. (a) Not later than December 1, 2009, the public
 safety director of the Department of Public Safety of the State of
 Texas shall adopt the rules required by Section 411.0604,
 Government Code, as added by this Act.
 (b) The change in law made by this Act in adding Subchapter
 D-1, Chapter 411, Government Code, applies to the inclusion of
 forensic DNA test results in the central index required to be
 established under that subchapter, regardless of whether the test
 results were obtained before, on, or after the effective date of
 this Act.
 SECTION 3. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.
 ______________________________ ______________________________
 President of the Senate Speaker of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2932 was passed by the House on April
 28, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 145, Nays 0, 1 present, not
 voting; and that the House concurred in Senate amendments to H.B.
 No. 2932 on May 29, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 141, Nays 1,
 1 present, not voting.
 ______________________________
 Chief Clerk of the House
 I certify that H.B. No. 2932 was passed by the Senate, with
 amendments, on May 27, 2009, by the following vote: Yeas 31, Nays
 0.
 ______________________________
 Secretary of the Senate
 APPROVED: __________________
 Date
 __________________
 Governor