Senate | 05/06/2009 | Referred to Criminal Justice | Journal Page: 2093 | |
Senate | 05/06/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2093 | |
Senate | 05/05/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2011 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 2554 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 2366 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Record vote | RV#512 | Journal Page: 2365 |
House | 05/04/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 2365 | |
House | 05/04/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 2365 | |
House | 05/02/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 2314 | |
House | 05/02/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 2314 | |
House | 05/02/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 04/29/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/21/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/20/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 1661 | |
House | 04/08/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/08/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/01/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/17/2009 | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence | Journal Page: 716 | |
House | 03/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 716 | |
House | 03/10/2009 | Filed |