Senate | 05/21/2009 | Referred to State Affairs | Journal Page: 2686 | |
Senate | 05/21/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 2686 | |
Senate | 05/14/2009 | Received from the House | Journal Page: 2367 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Reported engrossed | Journal Page: 3679 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | Journal Page: 3316 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Record vote | RV#793 | Journal Page: 3315 |
House | 05/13/2009 | Passed | Journal Page: 3315 | |
House | 05/13/2009 | Read 3rd time | Journal Page: 3315 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Passed to engrossment | Journal Page: 3274 | |
House | 05/12/2009 | Read 2nd time | Journal Page: 3274 | |
House | 05/08/2009 | Placed on General State Calendar | ||
House | 05/06/2009 | Rules suspended | Journal Page: 2594 | |
House | 05/05/2009 | Considered in Calendars | ||
House | 04/28/2009 | Committee report sent to Calendars | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Committee report printed and distributed | ||
House | 04/27/2009 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | Journal Page: 2009 | |
House | 04/22/2009 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | ||
House | 04/22/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Left pending in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Considered in public hearing | ||
House | 04/15/2009 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | ||
House | 03/17/2009 | Referred to Pensions, Investments & Financial Services | ||
House | 03/17/2009 | Read first time | Journal Page: 719 | |
House | 03/10/2009 | Filed |