Texas 2009 - 81st Regular

Texas House Bill HB2986 Latest Draft

Bill / Engrossed Version Filed 02/01/2025

Download
.pdf .doc .html
                            81R4624 KCR-F
 By: Phillips H.B. No. 2986


 A BILL TO BE ENTITLED
 AN ACT
 relating to the participation of certain retired employees of
 juvenile probation departments in the group benefits plan for state
 employees.
 BE IT ENACTED BY THE LEGISLATURE OF THE STATE OF TEXAS:
 SECTION 1. Section 1551.002, Insurance Code, is amended to
 read as follows:
 Sec. 1551.002. PURPOSES. The purposes of this chapter are
 to:
 (1) provide uniformity in life, accident, and health
 benefit coverages for all state officers and employees and their
 dependents;
 (2) enable the state to attract and retain competent
 and able employees by providing employees and their dependents with
 life, accident, and health benefit coverages at least equal to
 those commonly provided in private industry;
 (3) foster, promote, and encourage employment by and
 service to the state as a career profession for individuals of high
 standards of competence and ability;
 (4) recognize and protect the state's investment in
 each permanent employee by promoting and preserving economic
 security and good health among employees and their dependents;
 (5) foster and develop high standards of
 employer-employee relationships between the state and its
 employees;
 (6) recognize the long and faithful service and
 dedication of state officers and employees and encourage them to
 remain in state service until eligible for retirement by providing
 health benefits for them and their dependents; [and]
 (7) recognize the service to the state by employees
 and retired employees of community supervision and corrections
 departments by extending to them and their dependents the same
 life, accident, and health benefit coverages as those provided
 under this chapter to state employees, retired state employees, and
 their dependents; and
 (8)  recognize the service to the state by retired
 employees of juvenile probation departments who retire from
 departments located in counties with populations of less than
 150,000 by extending to those retired employees the same life,
 accident, and health benefit coverages as those provided under this
 chapter to retired state employees.
 SECTION 2. Section 1551.111(c), Insurance Code, is amended
 to read as follows:
 (c) Except as provided by Section 1551.114 and 1551.115,
 participation in the group benefits program does not extend to:
 (1) the governing body of either system;
 (2) a municipality or subdivision participating in
 either system; or
 (3) a trustee, officer, or employee, or a dependent of
 a trustee, officer, or employee, of a participating municipality or
 subdivision.
 SECTION 3. Subchapter C, Chapter 1551, Insurance Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1551.115 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1551.115.  PARTICIPATION BY RETIRED EMPLOYEES OF
 CERTAIN JUVENILE PROBATION DEPARTMENTS. (a)  In this section,
 "retired employee of a juvenile probation department" means an
 employee of a department that is established under Chapter 142,
 Human Resources Code, located in a county with a population of less
 than 150,000 who retires from that department.
 (b)  A retired employee of a juvenile probation department
 shall be treated as an annuitant for purposes of this chapter only
 as provided by this section.
 (c)  A retired employee of a juvenile probation department
 may participate in the group benefits program administered by the
 board of trustees under this chapter. Participation under this
 section is limited to retired employees of juvenile probation
 departments who are described by Subsections (d) and (e).
 (d)  For a retired employee of a juvenile probation
 department who is, on August 31, 2009, employed by a juvenile
 probation department located in a county with a population of less
 than 150,000, the retired employee may participate in the group
 benefits program if:
 (1) the retired employee:
 (A)  retires from the juvenile probation
 department on or after September 1, 2009;
 (B)  has at least 10 years of creditable service
 earned for service at one or more juvenile probation departments;
 and
 (C)  meets all the requirements for retirement
 benefits prescribed by the Texas County and District Retirement
 System; and
 (2)  the juvenile probation department from which the
 retired employee of a juvenile probation department retires:
 (A)  does not provide retired employees access to
 a health benefit plan on or after the effective date of the
 employee's retirement; or
 (B)  provides retired employees access to a health
 benefit plan on or after the effective date of the employee's
 retirement that provides coverage that is less comprehensive than
 the coverage provided to annuitants under the basic coverage for
 annuitants.
 (e)  For a retired employee of a juvenile probation
 department located in a county with a population of less than
 150,000 who is not described by Subsection (d) and who is employed
 by the department on or after September 1, 2009, the retired
 employee may participate in the group benefits program if:
 (1) the retired employee:
 (A)  retires from the juvenile probation
 department on or after September 1, 2019;
 (B)  has at least 10 years of creditable service
 earned for service at one or more juvenile probation departments on
 or after September 1, 2009; and
 (C)  meets all the requirements for retirement
 benefits prescribed by the Texas County and District Retirement
 System; and
 (2)  the juvenile probation department from which the
 retired employee of a juvenile probation department retires:
 (A)  does not provide retired employees access to
 a health benefit plan on or after the effective date of the
 employee's retirement; or
 (B)  provides retired employees access to a health
 benefit plan on or after the effective date of the employee's
 retirement that provides coverage that is less comprehensive than
 the coverage provided to annuitants under the basic coverage for
 annuitants.
 (f)  A retired employee of a juvenile probation department is
 eligible to participate in the group benefits program under this
 section on application to the board of trustees. On application, a
 retired employee is automatically covered by the basic coverage for
 annuitants unless the retired employee is expelled from the
 program.
 (g)  The retired employee is eligible to receive a state
 contribution under Subchapter G for premiums to the same extent as
 an individual eligible to participate as an annuitant under Section
 1551.102.
 (h)  Each participating retired employee of a juvenile
 probation department shall pay that portion of the cost of group
 coverage selected by the retired employee that exceeds the amount
 of the state contribution. The retired employee shall pay
 contributions required from the retired employee in the manner
 prescribed by the board of trustees.
 SECTION 4. Subchapter G, Chapter 1551, Insurance Code, is
 amended by adding Section 1551.325 to read as follows:
 Sec. 1551.325.  REQUIRED REPORTS OF CERTAIN JUVENILE
 PROBATION DEPARTMENTS. Not later than June 1 of each year, a
 juvenile probation department located in a county with a population
 of less than 150,000 shall submit to the board of trustees a good
 faith estimate of the number of retired employees and active
 employees employed on June 1 but expected to retire before the next
 June 1 that may elect to enroll in the group benefits program for
 the following fiscal year.
 SECTION 5. (a) The Employees Retirement System of Texas
 shall develop a plan for the extension of benefits under the group
 benefits program to retired employees of juvenile probation
 departments eligible to participate in the group benefits program
 under Section 1551.115, Insurance Code, as added by this Act. The
 Employees Retirement System of Texas shall adopt rules necessary to
 implement this subsection not later than September 1, 2010.
 (b) Coverage under Section 1551.115, Insurance Code, as
 added by this Act, shall become effective September 1, 2010.
 SECTION 6. This Act takes effect September 1, 2009.